Rogers v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Petitioner: Daniel Rogers
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Case Number: 1:2022cv00571
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FCI Berlin, Warden. Attorney Seth R. Aframe added to party FCI Berlin, Warden(pty:res).Follow up on Objection on 2/21/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Aframe, Seth)
January 20, 2023 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to FCI Berlin, Warden (U.S. Department of Justice).(ko)
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to FCI Berlin, Warden Served/Mailed on 1/9/2023. (ko)
January 5, 2023 SERVICE BY CLERK re Petition (Doc. No. 1), Addendum (Doc. No. 2): Copy delivered to the United States Attorney for the District of New Hampshire, Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to FCI Berlin, Warden.(ko)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(ko)
December 30, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 3/3/2023.(ed) (ed).
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 Addendum to #1 Petition/MOTION to Supplement Emergency Motion for Habeas Corpus filed by Daniel Rogers.(ed) Modified on 1/4/2023 to add: Addendum docket text per order dated 1/4/2022.(ko)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 Emergency Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241. See also Criminal Case No. 17-cr-33-JL filed by Daniel Rogers.(ed)
December 30, 2022 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(ed) (ed).
December 30, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-571-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
December 30, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?