MRFRANCHISE, INC. et al v. Stratford Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MRFRANCHISE, INC., Mike Rapipoor and Mike Rafipoor
Defendant: Stratford Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00572
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2023 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - ACTION REQUIRED - SECOND NOTICE - re: NO DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FILED as to Stratford Insurance Company. Stratford Insurance Company shall file a Diversity Disclosure Statement using the Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents/Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 2/28/2023.(kad)
February 8, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 03/09/2023. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 3/9/2023. (kad)
February 7, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cheryl Dunn Soto on behalf of MRFRANCHISE, INC., Mike Rafipoor Attorney Cheryl Dunn Soto added to party MRFRANCHISE, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Cheryl Dunn Soto added to party Mike Rafipoor(pty:pla).(Soto, Cheryl)
February 7, 2023 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2023 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/9/2023. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
February 7, 2023 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - ACTION REQUIRED - re: NO DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FILED as to Stratford Insurance Company. Effective 12/1/2022 F.R.Civ.P. 7.1 was amended to require that parties or intervenors in diversity cases must file a Diversity Disclosure Statement with the first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response orother request address to the court. Stratford Insurance Company shall file a Diversity Disclosure Statement using the Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents/Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 2/14/2023.(kad)
February 6, 2023 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 03/09/2023 filed by Stratford Insurance Company.(Holtslag, Tamara)
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tamara Smith Holtslag on behalf of Stratford Insurance Company Attorney Tamara Smith Holtslag added to party Stratford Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Holtslag, Tamara)
January 25, 2023 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Stratford Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/17/2023. Answer Follow Up on 2/7/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Service on Defendant Stratford Insurance Company)(Steadman, Graham)
January 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua D. Franklin on behalf of MRFRANCHISE, INC., Mike Rafipoor Attorney Joshua D. Franklin added to party MRFRANCHISE, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua D. Franklin added to party Mike Rafipoor(pty:pla).(Franklin, Joshua)
January 9, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Cheryl Dunn Soto to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2330829.) filed by MRFRANCHISE, INC., Mike Rafipoor.Follow up on Objection on 1/23/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Cheryl Dunn Soto)(Rouvalis, Mark)
January 9, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Joshua D. Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2330821.) filed by MRFRANCHISE, INC., Mike Rafipoor.Follow up on Objection on 1/23/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Joshua D. Franklin)(Rouvalis, Mark)
January 9, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Joshua D. Franklin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
January 9, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Cheryl Dunn Soto to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
January 4, 2023 Filing 6 Summons issued electronically as to Stratford Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(ed)
January 4, 2023 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Graham Steadman on behalf of MRFRANCHISE, INC., Mike Rafipoor Attorney Graham Steadman added to party MRFRANCHISE, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Graham Steadman added to party Mike Rafipoor(pty:pla).(Steadman, Graham)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement by MRFRANCHISE, INC., Mike Rafipoor identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to them. (Rouvalis, Mark)
December 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 2/21/2023.(ed)
December 30, 2022 Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-572-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
December 30, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by MRFRANCHISE, INC. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Rouvalis, Mark)
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2328385 filed by MRFRANCHISE, INC., Mike Rapipoor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver Summons to Defendant)(Rouvalis, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2023: #4 Corrected Summons) (cmp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MRFRANCHISE, INC. et al v. Stratford Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MRFRANCHISE, INC.
Represented By: Mark C. Rouvalis
Represented By: Cheryl Dunn Soto
Represented By: Graham Steadman
Represented By: Joshua D. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Rapipoor
Represented By: Mark C. Rouvalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Rafipoor
Represented By: Cheryl Dunn Soto
Represented By: Graham Steadman
Represented By: Joshua D. Franklin
Represented By: Mark C. Rouvalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratford Insurance Company
Represented By: Tamara Smith Holtslag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?