Quintero v. W. R. Berkley Corporation
Plaintiff: Janet Quintero
Defendant: W. R. Berkley Corporation
Case Number: 1:2023cv00015
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Filing 6 ///NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to W.R. Berkley Corportion by Janet Quintero(Kline, Nicholas)
February 9, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (lw)
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2022-CV-00318, Strafford Superior Court County Superior Court(Boucher, Gregory)
January 17, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (lw)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement by W. R. Berkley Corporation identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to them. (Boucher, Gregory)
January 13, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by W. R. Berkley Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Boucher, Gregory)
January 13, 2023 Filing 2 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by W. R. Berkley Corporation.(Boucher, Gregory)
January 13, 2023 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(ed)
January 12, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-15-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Strafford Superior Court State of New Hampshire, case number 219-2022-CV-00318 Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 332 filed by W. R. Berkley Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 2/2/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B Police Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boucher, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2023: #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintero v. W. R. Berkley Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Quintero
Represented By: Nicholas G. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. R. Berkley Corporation
Represented By: Gregory M. Boucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?