Boaggio's Bread Inc.
Debtor: Boaggio's Bread Inc.
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Trustee: Nicole M. Nigrelli
Case Number: 1:2025bk11845
Filed: February 24, 2025
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jerrold N Poslusny
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2025 Filing 49 CONSENT ORDER ON DEBTORS MOTION FOR ORDER REJECTING NONRESIDENTIAL LEASE WITH 900JERSEY HOLDINGS, LLC FOR COMMERCIAL SPACE LOCATED AT 900 JERSEY AVENUE, GLOUCESTER CITY, NJ 08030 . (Related Doc #11). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/24/2025. (kvr)
April 22, 2025 Filing 48 Certification Concerning Proposed Order (related document:#11 Motion to Reject Nonresidential Lease with 900 Jersey Holdings, LLC of Commercial Space Located at 900 Jersey Avenue, Gloucester City, New Jersey 08030 Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 11:00 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certification # 3 Exhibit A # 4 Brief) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/26/2025 OBJECTION DEADLINE MUST BE LISTED IN NOTICE OF MOTION. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Hearing set for 03/25/2025 @ 11:00 a.m.. Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
April 21, 2025 Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#47 Certification Concerning Proposed Order filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Type of Error: INCORRECT DOCUMENT, filed by E. Richard Dressel, Esq. PLEASE CORRECT USING THE NEW CERTIFICATION FORM. CHAMBERS HAS E-MAILED DEBTOR'S ATTORNEY. (kvr)
April 17, 2025 Filing 47 Certification Concerning Proposed Order (related document:#11 Motion to Reject Nonresidential Lease with 900 Jersey Holdings, LLC of Commercial Space Located at 900 Jersey Avenue, Gloucester City, New Jersey 08030 Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 11:00 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certification # 3 Exhibit A # 4 Brief) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/26/2025 OBJECTION DEADLINE MUST BE LISTED IN NOTICE OF MOTION. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Hearing set for 03/25/2025 @ 11:00 am. Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)Modified on 4/21/2025INCORRECT FORM USED (kvr).
April 17, 2025 Minute of 4/17/2025 Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Status filed; Adjourned to 5/15/2025 (related document:#8 Notice of Hearing for: Subchapter V Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 05/27/2025. (Dressel, E.) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Section 1111(b) Election Deadline is no later than 14 days from the filing of the debtors plan. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden..Subchapter V Status Report Due By 4/3/2025:) Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2025 at 10:00 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cm)
April 10, 2025 Filing 46 Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 5/15/2025 at 10:00am. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. (related document:#8 Notice of Hearing (Upload)) (kvr)
April 8, 2025 Filing 45 Certificate of Service. filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.). Related document(s) #44 Status Report filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Modified on 4/9/2025 (lgr).
April 7, 2025 Filing 44 Status Report for Subchapter V filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
April 5, 2025 Filing 43 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
April 3, 2025 Filing 42 FINAL ORDER GRANTING DEBTORS MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF PREPETITION WAGES, SALARIES, WITHHOLDING TAXES, DESIGNATED PAYMENTS AND EMPLOYEE BENEFITS. (Related Doc #4). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/3/2025. (kvr)
April 3, 2025 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Pamela Elchert Thurmond on behalf of LAW DEPT CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. (Thurmond, Pamela)
April 3, 2025 AMENDED Minute of Hearing Held, 4/3/2025 OUTCOME: No objections, Order will be signed (related document:#4 Motion re: Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Withholding Taxes, Designated Payments and Employee Benefits Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc... (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certification #3 Exhibit A) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/25/2025 INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT . Filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) (kvr)
April 3, 2025 Minute of 4/3/2025 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Allowed as requested; Order will be signed (related document:#4 Motion re: Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Withholding Taxes, Designated Payments and Employee Benefits Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc... (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certification #3 Exhibit A) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/25/2025 INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT . Filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) (cm)
March 25, 2025 Minute of 3/25/2025 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Settled; COTBS (related document:#11 Motion to Reject Nonresidential Lease with 900 Jersey Holdings, LLC of Commercial Space Located at 900 Jersey Avenue, Gloucester City, New Jersey 08030 Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 11:00 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certification #3 Exhibit A #4 Brief) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/26/2025 OBJECTION DEADLINE MUST BE LISTED IN NOTICE OF MOTION. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE . Filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) (cm)
March 23, 2025 Filing 40 Certificate of Service (related document:#35 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s)or Document(s)) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 21, 2025 Filing 39 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/21/2025. (Admin.)
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Granting Application to Employ Lex Nova Law LLC as Attorney for Debtor (Related Doc #3). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/18/2025. (kvr)
March 18, 2025 Minute of 3/18/2025 Hearing Held, OUTCOME: OSC Withdrawn (related document:#9 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,E/F,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/24/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2025 at 10:30 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden..) (cm)
March 17, 2025 Filing 37 Document re: Letter to Creditors and Parties-in-Interest re Call-In Number for 341 Meeting of Creditors scheduled for April 3, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. on behalf of Debtor. filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 16, 2025 Filing 36 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/16/2025. (Admin.)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) E/F (related document:#31 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/14/2025. (lgr)
March 13, 2025 Filing 34 Document IN SUPPORT (related document:#32 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.) Modified on 3/13/2025 TO CLARIFY DOCKET TEXT (dmb).
March 13, 2025 Amended Remark(related document: #30 Document filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (lgr)
March 12, 2025 Filing 33 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 36. Notice Date 03/12/2025. (Admin.)
March 12, 2025 Filing 32 Amendment to List of Creditors Fee Amount $ 34. Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)TO REFLECT INCORRECT EVENT CODE THIS IS AMENDED SCHEDULES E/F Modified on 3/12/2025 (lgr).
March 12, 2025 Filing 31 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,E/F,H, filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 12, 2025 Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#32 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Type of Error: INCORRECT EVENT CODE,IN THE FUTURE PLEASE REFER TO LOCAL RULE , D.N.J. LBR 1009-1. Amendment to Schedule or List of Creditors A debtor seeking to amend Schedules D through H or the List of Creditors must file the corresponding Official Form. ***IF THE AMENDMENT ADDS A CREDITOR TO SCHEDULE D,E,F,G, OR H, THE DEBTOR MUST ALSO FILE AN AMENDED LIST OF CREDITORS, AND INCLUDE ONLY THE ADDRED CREDITOR(S). filed by E. Richard Dressel. (lgr)
March 12, 2025 Remark(related document: #31 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). STILL MISSING: Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash-Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (If Applicable) (lgr)
March 12, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors (Fee)(# 25-11845-JNP) [misc,amdcma] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47907556, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#32) (U.S. Treasury)
March 11, 2025 Filing 30 Document re: Certification re Debtor's Financials Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. S. 1116(1)(B) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 11, 2025 AMENDED Remark (related document: #26 Balance Sheet filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc., #28 Tax Information filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc., #29 Tax Information filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). STILL MISSING: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Schedules A/B,E/F,H, Atty Disclosure Statement, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why Statement of Operations and Cash-Flow Statement, is not being filed (If Applicable). (dmb)
March 10, 2025 Filing 29 Tax Information for the Year 2022 filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 10, 2025 Filing 28 Tax Information for the Year 2023 filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 10, 2025 Filing 27 Document re: Profit & Loss (01/01/2024 - 12/31/2024) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 10, 2025 Filing 26 Balance Sheet filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 10, 2025 Filing 25 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/3/2025 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 5/5/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/25/2025. (cmf)
March 10, 2025 Remark(related document: #26 Balance Sheet filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc., #28 Tax Information filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc., #29 Tax Information filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). STILL MISSING: Atty Disclosure Statement, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash-Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (If Applicable), Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Schedules A/B,E/F,H, (lgr)
March 5, 2025 Filing 24 Amended Certificate of Service (related document:#21 Certificate of Service filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
March 5, 2025 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Robert M. Kline on behalf of North Star Leasing, a Division of Peoples Bank. (Kline, Robert)
March 2, 2025 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2025. (Admin.)
February 28, 2025 Minute of 2/28/2025 Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Motion granted on an interim basis. Final hearing scheduled for 4/3/2025 at 10:00 am (related document: #4 Motion re: Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Withholding Taxes, Designated Payments and Employee Benefits Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc... (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certification #3 Exhibit A) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/25/2025 INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT . Filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2025 at 10:00 AM , JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cm)
February 28, 2025 Filing 21 Certificate of Service (related document:#20 Order (Generic)) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
February 28, 2025 Filing 20 Interim Order Granting Debtor's Motion For Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Withholding Taxes, Designated Payments and Employee Benefits with final hearing date set for 4/3/2025 at 10:00am (related document:#4 Motion re: Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Withholding Taxes, Designated Payments and Employee Benefits Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.(Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/25/2025 INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT . filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/28/2025. (kvr)
February 27, 2025 Filing 19 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/27/2025. (Admin.)
February 27, 2025 Filing 18 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/27/2025. (Admin.)
February 27, 2025 Filing 17 BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/27/2025. (Admin.)
February 27, 2025 Filing 16 Notice of Appointment of Nicole M. Nigrelli as Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee. U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Nicole M. Nigrelli) (United States Trustee, by Martha Hildebrandt, Assistant United States Trustee)
February 27, 2025 Filing 15 Certificate of Service (related document:#3 Application for Retention filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
February 27, 2025 Filing 14 Certificate of Service (related document:#11 Motion to Reject filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
February 26, 2025 Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#11 Motion to Reject filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Type of Error: OBJECTION DEADLINE MUST BE LISTED IN NOTICE OF MOTION, filed by E. Richard Dressel. Please correct, serve, and refile Notice of Motion as support and link to original motion. (cm)
February 26, 2025 Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. (related document:#11 Motion to Reject Nonresidential Lease with 900 Jersey Holdings, LLC of Commercial Space Located at 900 Jersey Avenue, Gloucester City, New Jersey 08030 Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.). (cm)
February 25, 2025 Filing 13 Amended Certification in Support of Motion (corrected case no.) in support of (related document:#4 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
February 25, 2025 Filing 12 Certificate of Service (related document:#4 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
February 25, 2025 Filing 11 Motion to Reject Nonresidential Lease with 900 Jersey Holdings, LLC of Commercial Space Located at 900 Jersey Avenue, Gloucester City, New Jersey 08030 Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 11:00 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certification #3 Exhibit A #4 Brief) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/26/2025 OBJECTION DEADLINE MUST BE LISTED IN NOTICE OF MOTION. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (McAuley, Catherine).
February 25, 2025 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jeffrey M. Sponder on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Sponder, Jeffrey)
February 25, 2025 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing for: Subchapter V Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 05/27/2025. (Dressel, E.) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Section 1111(b) Election Deadline is no later than 14 days from the filing of the debtors plan. Hearing scheduled for 4/17/2025 at 10:00 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden..Subchapter V Status Report Due By 4/3/2025: (kvr)
February 25, 2025 Filing 7 Hearing Scheduled. (related document:#4 Motion re: Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Withholding Taxes, Designated Payments and Employee Benefits Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc. (Dressel, E.) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2025 at 11:30 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.. (kvr)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Granting Application for Expediting Consideration of First Day Matters (Related Doc #5). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/25/2025. . (kvr)
February 25, 2025 Filing 5 Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters (related document:#4 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dressel, E.)
February 25, 2025 Filing 4 Motion re: Motion for Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Withholding Taxes, Designated Payments and Employee Benefits Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc... (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certification #3 Exhibit A) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/25/2025 INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT (McAuley, Catherine).
February 25, 2025 Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#4 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Type of Error: INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON CERTIFICATION IN SUPPORT, filed by E. Richard Dressel. Please correct and refile Certification as support and link to original motion. (cm)
February 25, 2025 Remark: Location of Debtor's Principal Assets is 900 Jersey Avenue, Gloucester City, NJ 08030 (related document: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). (def)
February 25, 2025 Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. (related document:#3 Application For Retention of Professional Lex Nova Law LLC as Attorney Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.). (cm)
February 25, 2025 Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#3 Application for Retention filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.). Type of Error: INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON PROPOSED ORDER., filed by E. Richard Dressel. Please correct email Proposed Order to chambers. (cm)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,E/F,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/24/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2025 at 10:30 AM, JNP - Courtroom 4C, Camden.. (lgr)
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 Application For Retention of Professional Lex Nova Law LLC as Attorney Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Objections due by 3/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certification) (Dressel, E.) Modified on 2/25/2025 INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON PROPOSED ORDER. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED (McAuley, Catherine).
February 24, 2025 Filing 2 Document re: Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition (related document:#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Boaggio's Bread Inc.) filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. (Dressel, E.)
February 24, 2025 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by E. Richard Dressel on behalf of Boaggio's Bread Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 05/27/2025. (Dressel, E.)
February 24, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 25-11845) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47842882, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Boaggio's Bread Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Boaggio's Bread Inc.
Represented By: E. Richard Dressel
Represented By: Lex Nova Law, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Nicole M. Nigrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?