John Street Associates, LLC
Debtor: John Street Associates, LLC
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2024bk21112
Filed: November 7, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stacey L Meisel
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Filing 35 in support of (related document:#16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Crown Bank) filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B) (Tabachnik, Douglas)
December 23, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Withdrawn on the record (related document: #27 Cross Motion re: Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral (related document:#16 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 4 John Street, Morristown, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199. filed by Creditor Crown Bank) Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Verified Application in Support of Motion) Filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) (omf)
December 23, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held. OUTCOME: Continued; Interim Order to be Submitted (related document: #16 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 4 John Street, Morristown, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199. Filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certification regarding Calculation of Amount Due #2 Certification of Jacinto Rodrigues #3 Exhibit A #4 Exhibit B #5 Exhibit C #6 Exhibit D #7 Certification of Douglas T. Tabachnik, Esq. #8 Exhibit A #9 Exhibit B #10 Exhibit C #11 Exhibit D #12 Exhibit E #13 Exhibit F #14 Proposed Order) Filed by Creditor Crown Bank) Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2025 at 02:30 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
December 23, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held. OUTCOME: Continued (related document: #25 Notice of Hearing (related document:#14 Application For Retention of Professional Marcus & Millichap as Realtor Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC, #20 Limited Objection filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.) Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2025 at 02:30 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
December 23, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held. OUTCOME: Continued (related document: #24 Notice of Hearing (related document:#9 Application For Retention of Professional Collins, Vella & Casello, LLC as Attorney Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC, #20 Limited Objection filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.) Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2025 at 02:30 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
December 11, 2024 Filing 34 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/11/2024. (Admin.)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 24-21111 Member Cases: 24-21112 (Related Doc #7). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/9/2024. (ntp)
December 9, 2024 Filing 32 Document re: Notice of Telephonic 341 Meeting filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. (Casello, Joseph)
December 9, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Matter To Be Decided on the Papers (related document: #7 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-21111, 24-21112 Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anthony D'Auria #2 Proposed Order) Modified on 11/12/2024 the hearing time from 10:00 AM to 11:00 AM (ntp). Filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) (ntp)
December 9, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/9/2024 (related document: #16 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 4 John Street, Morristown, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199. Filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certification regarding Calculation of Amount Due #2 Certification of Jacinto Rodrigues #3 Exhibit A #4 Exhibit B #5 Exhibit C #6 Exhibit D #7 Certification of Douglas T. Tabachnik, Esq. #8 Exhibit A #9 Exhibit B #10 Exhibit C #11 Exhibit D #12 Exhibit E #13 Exhibit F #14 Proposed Order) Filed by Creditor Crown Bank)Hearing scheduled for 12/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
December 6, 2024 Filing 31 Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 12/23/2024 at 11:00 a.m.. The hearing date is Not Peremptory. (related document:#9 Application for Retention filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC, #14 Application for Retention filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC, #16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Crown Bank, #27 Cross Motion filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) (omf)
December 6, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/09/2024 (related document: #24 Notice of Hearing (related document:#9 Application For Retention of Professional Collins, Vella & Casello, LLC as Attorney Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC, #20 Limited Objection filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.) Hearing scheduled for 12/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
December 6, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/09/2024 (related document: #25 Notice of Hearing (related document:#14 Application For Retention of Professional Marcus & Millichap as Realtor Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC, #20 Limited Objection filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.) Hearing scheduled for 12/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
December 6, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/09/2024 (related document: #27 Cross Motion re: Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral (related document:#16 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 4 John Street, Morristown, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199. filed by Creditor Crown Bank) Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Verified Application in Support of Motion) Filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 12/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
December 5, 2024 Filing 30 Certificate of Service (related document:#27 Cross Motion filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. (Casello, Joseph)
December 5, 2024 Minute of Hearing Scheduled, OUTCOME: Statisfied; Missing Document Filed (related document: #3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,C,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/8/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 08:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.) (omf)
December 5, 2024 Remark(related document: #26 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC). No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (mlc)
December 4, 2024 Filing 29 BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
December 4, 2024 Filing 28 BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
December 4, 2024 Filing 27 Cross Motion re: Authorizing Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral (related document:#16 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 4 John Street, Morristown, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199. filed by Creditor Crown Bank) Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Verified Application in Support of Motion) (Casello, Joseph)
December 4, 2024 Filing 26 Missing Document(s): Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. (Casello, Joseph)
December 3, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/3/2024 (related document: #3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,C,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/8/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 08:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.)Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
December 3, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/3/2024 (related document: #7 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-21111, 24-21112 Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anthony D'Auria #2 Proposed Order) Modified on 11/12/2024 the hearing time from 10:00 AM to 11:00 AM (ntp). Filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC)Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
December 3, 2024 Remark(related document: #22 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC). STILL MISSING: Statement of Corporate Ownership (mlc)
December 2, 2024 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing (related document:#14 Application For Retention of Professional Marcus & Millichap as Realtor Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC, #20 Limited Objection filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
December 2, 2024 Filing 24 Notice of Hearing (related document:#9 Application For Retention of Professional Collins, Vella & Casello, LLC as Attorney Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC, #20 Limited Objection filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
November 28, 2024 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
November 27, 2024 Filing 22 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. (Casello, Joseph)
November 27, 2024 Filing 21 Certificate of Service (related document:#20 Objection filed by Creditor Crown Bank) filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
November 27, 2024 Filing 20 Limited Objection to Omnibus Objection of Crown Bank to the Respective Applications for Retention of Counsel for the Debtor and Proposed Realtor (related document:#9 Application For Retention of Professional Collins, Vella & Casello, LLC as Attorney Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Objections due by 12/2/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Professional # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC, #14 Application For Retention of Professional Marcus & Millichap as Realtor Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Objections due by 12/2/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Charles Collins # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
November 27, 2024 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (related document:#16 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Crown Bank, #18 Order on Application to Shorten Time) filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:#16 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 4 John Street, Morristown, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199. filed by Creditor Crown Bank). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/9/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
November 25, 2024 Filing 17 Application to Shorten Time (related document:#16 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 4 John Street, Morristown, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199. filed by Creditor Crown Bank) Filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tabachnik, Douglas)
November 25, 2024 Filing 16 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 4 John Street, Morristown, NJ. Fee Amount $ 199. Filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certification regarding Calculation of Amount Due #2 Certification of Jacinto Rodrigues #3 Exhibit A #4 Exhibit B #5 Exhibit C #6 Exhibit D #7 Certification of Douglas T. Tabachnik, Esq. #8 Exhibit A #9 Exhibit B #10 Exhibit C #11 Exhibit D #12 Exhibit E #13 Exhibit F #14 Proposed Order) (Tabachnik, Douglas)
November 25, 2024 Filing 15 Certificate of Service (related document:#14 Application for Retention filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. (Casello, Joseph)
November 25, 2024 Filing 14 Application For Retention of Professional Marcus & Millichap as Realtor Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Objections due by 12/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Charles Collins #2 Proposed Order) (Casello, Joseph)
November 25, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(# 24-21112-SLM) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47517379, fee amount $ 199.00. (re: Doc#16) (U.S. Treasury)
November 20, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/03/2024 at 8:30 a.m. (related document:#3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,C,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/8/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 08:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.) Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf) Modified on 11/20/2024 to change hearing time to coincide with other matters on the calendar (omf).
November 15, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Douglas T Tabachnik on behalf of Crown Bank. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
November 14, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David Gerardi on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Gerardi, David)
November 13, 2024 Filing 11 Supplemental Certificate of Service (related document:#7 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. (Casello, Joseph)
November 13, 2024 Filing 10 Certificate of Service (related document:#9 Application for Retention filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. (Casello, Joseph)
November 12, 2024 Filing 9 Application For Retention of Professional Collins, Vella & Casello, LLC as Attorney Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Objections due by 12/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Professional #2 Proposed Order) (Casello, Joseph)
November 12, 2024 Filing 8 Certificate of Service (related document:#7 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC) filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. (Casello, Joseph)
November 12, 2024 Filing 7 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-21111, 24-21112 Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Anthony D'Auria #2 Proposed Order) (Casello, Joseph) Modified on 11/12/2024 the hearing time from 10:00 AM to 11:00 AM (ntp).
November 12, 2024 Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#7 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor John Street Associates, LLC). Type of Error: Incorrect hearing time scheduled, filed by Joseph Casello. The Court will schedule the hearing to 11:00 AM. Please notify interested parties of the hearing time. (ntp)
November 10, 2024 Filing 6 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/10/2024. (Admin.)
November 10, 2024 Filing 5 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 11/10/2024. (Admin.)
November 8, 2024 Filing 4 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/11/2024 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 1/16/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/6/2025. (rah)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,C,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/8/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/3/2024 at 08:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
November 8, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment. Judge John K. Sherwood removed from the case. Judge Stacey L. Meisel added to the case. (rah)
November 7, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Joseph Casello on behalf of John Street Associates, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/7/2025. (Casello, Joseph)
November 7, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-21112) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47450989, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: John Street Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: John Street Associates, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Casello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: David Gerardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?