TA 4 Realty LLC
Debtor: TA 4 Realty LLC
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2024bk21243
Filed: November 12, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Vincent F Papalia
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Filing 16 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/08/2025. (Admin.)
January 8, 2025 Filing 15 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/08/2025. (Admin.)
January 7, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/9/2025 (related document: #7 Notice of Hearing for: General Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of TA 4 Realty LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/12/2025. filed by Debtor TA 4 Realty LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. ) Status Conference Hearing scheduled for 02/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting Application to Employ Webber McGill LLC as counsel for debtor (Related Doc #13). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/3/2025. (jf)
December 23, 2024 Filing 13 Application For Retention of Professional Webber McGill LLC as Attorneys Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of TA 4 Realty LLC. Objection deadline is 12/30/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Douglas J. McGill, Esq. #2 Proposed Order) (McGill, Douglas)
December 17, 2024 Filing 12 Document re: Notice of Telephonic Meeting of Creditors (related document:#4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of TA 4 Realty LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
December 10, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David Gerardi on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Gerardi, David)
December 10, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Laura M. Egerman on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but solely as Owner Trustee of CIM Trust 2022-I1. (Egerman, Laura)
December 10, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Satisfied (related document: #3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/13/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.) (mcp)
December 9, 2024 Filing 9 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of TA 4 Realty LLC. (McGill, Douglas)
December 9, 2024 Remark. STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (dlr)
November 21, 2024 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/21/2024. (Admin.)
November 19, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing for: General Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of TA 4 Realty LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/12/2025. filed by Debtor TA 4 Realty LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/9/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
November 16, 2024 Filing 6 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 11/16/2024. (Admin.)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/15/2024. (Admin.)
November 14, 2024 Filing 4 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 1/21/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/12/2025. (rah)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/13/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2024 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Browne, Christopher)
November 12, 2024 Filing 2 Case Assignment. Judge Vincent F. Papalia added to the case, Associated Cases 24-15167, 24-15881, 24-15883, 24-16185, 24-16214, 24-16216, 24-16217, 24-16219, 24-16221, 24-16223, 24-16836. 24-16838, and 24-16840. (rah)
November 12, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Douglas J. McGill on behalf of TA 4 Realty LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/12/2025. (McGill, Douglas)
November 12, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-21243) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47463634, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: TA 4 Realty LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: TA 4 Realty LLC
Represented By: Douglas J. McGill
Represented By: Webber McGill LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: David Gerardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?