DIA Investment Group LLC
Debtor: DIA Investment Group LLC
Trustee: Scott S. Rever
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2024bk21542
Filed: November 20, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John K Sherwood
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Matter To Be Decided on the Papers (related document: #22 Application for Compensation for Scott S. Rever, Trustee Chapter 11, period: 11/20/2024 to 12/11/2024, fee: $1,710.00, expenses: $0.00. Filed by Scott S. Rever. Hearing scheduled for 1/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Attachments: #1 First and final application for allowance of fees and reimbursement to Subchapter V Trustee, Scott S. Rever, Esq. #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Proposed Order granting allowances) Filed by Trustee Scott S. Rever) (mff)
January 10, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Granting Application to Employ SILVERMAN LAW PLLC as attorney for the Debtor. (Related Doc #29). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/10/2025. (zlh)
January 8, 2025 Filing 37 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 12 69th Street, Guttenberg, NJ 07093. Fee Amount $ 199. Filed by Steven P. Kelly on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee of the New Residential Mortgage Loan Trust 2021-NQM2R. Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Certification of Creditor Regarding Calculation of AMount Due #3 Exhibit A -- Endorsed Note #4 Exhibit B -- Recorded Mortgage #5 Exhibit C -- Assignment(s) of Mortgage #6 Exhibit D -- Loan Modification #7 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary #8 Certificate of Service) (Kelly, Steven)
January 8, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(# 24-21542-JKS) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47661418, fee amount $ 199.00. (re: Doc#37) (U.S. Treasury)
January 7, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Satisfied. All required documents have benn filed. (related document: #2 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable) . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/21/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.) (mff)
January 7, 2025 Remark. STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (dmc)
January 6, 2025 Filing 36 Response to (related document:#2 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/21/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (dlr), Hearing Rescheduled from 12/17/2024- Courtesy adjournment as new Counsel has been retained. (related document:#2 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/21/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.)Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)) filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. (Silverman, Brett)
January 3, 2025 Filing 35 Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to January 21, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (related document:#10 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Selene Finance LP, as Attorney in Fact for U.S. Bank Trust National Association not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust) (mff)
January 3, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/7/2025 (related document: #10 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 1442 44th Street, North Bergen, nj 07047. Fee Amount $ 199. Filed by Kenneth Borger Jr on behalf of Selene Finance LP, as Attorney in Fact for U.S. Bank Trust National Association not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Exhibits #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary #4 Proposed Order #5 Certificate of Service) Filed by Creditor Selene Finance LP, as Attorney in Fact for U.S. Bank Trust National Association not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust)Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
December 24, 2024 Filing 34 Certificate of Service (related document:#29 Application for Retention filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC) filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. (Silverman, Brett)
December 19, 2024 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Steven Eisenberg on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association, not in its individual capacity, but solely as owner trustee of the New Residential Mortgage Loan Trust 2021-NQM2R. (Eisenberg, Steven)
December 18, 2024 Filing 32 Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. (related document:#29 Application For Retention of Professional Silverman Law PLLC as attorney for the Debtor Filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC) (mff)
December 18, 2024 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Kenneth Borger Jr on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Borger, Kenneth)
December 17, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/17/2024- Courtesy adjournment as new Counsel has been retained. (related document: #2 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable) . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/21/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.)Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
December 17, 2024 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Adam Pollock on behalf of Bryan Macancela, Edison Macancela, Felipe Vega-Loyola, Milton Quizhpilema, Victor Gonzalez, Diego Estrada, Vladimir Yunga, Eduardo Yunga, Mario Asitimbay, Cristian Asitimbay, Nicolas Zhagnay, Cesar Supacela, Pellumb Katanolli, Jenaro Campoverde, Segundo Calle, Yoni De Los Santos, Samuel Herrera, Paulino Carpintero, Eder Gordillo, Abraham Campos. (Pollock, Adam)
December 17, 2024 Filing 29 Application For Retention of Professional Silverman Law PLLC as attorney for the Debtor Filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. Objection deadline is 12/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Application to Retain Silverman Law as Counsel to the Debtor #2 Affidavit Declaration of Brett S. Silverman in Support #3 Affidavit Lar Dan Affidavit #4 Proposed Order) (Silverman, Brett)
December 16, 2024 Hearing Withdrawn/ No longer a Sub Chapter V. (related document: #7 Notice of Hearing for: Subchapter V Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 2/18/2025. Modified to Correct Plan Due Deadline on 11/20/2024 . filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Section 1111(b) Election Deadline is no later than 14 days from the filing of the debtors plan. Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.Subchapter V Status Report Due By 1/21/2025: (zlh)) (zlh)
December 15, 2024 Filing 28 BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/15/2024. (Admin.)
December 13, 2024 Filing 27 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/13/2024. (Admin.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
December 12, 2024 Filing 23 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustees Report of No Distribution. Funds Collected: $0.00. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): Not Applicable, Assets Exempt: Not Applicable, Claims Scheduled: $751311.19, Claims Asserted: Not Available, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): Not Applicable. Filed by Scott S. Rever. (Rever, Scott)
December 12, 2024 Filing 22 Application for Compensation for Scott S. Rever, Trustee Chapter 11, period: 11/20/2024 to 12/11/2024, fee: $1,710.00, expenses: $0.00. Filed by Scott S. Rever. Hearing scheduled for 1/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Attachments: #1 First and final application for allowance of fees and reimbursement to Subchapter V Trustee, Scott S. Rever, Esq. #2 Exhibit A #3 Exhibit B #4 Proposed Order granting allowances) (Rever, Scott)
December 11, 2024 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Jordan, Brian)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) D (related document:#14 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/11/2024. (dlr)
December 10, 2024 Filing 19 Chapter 11 Small Business Scheduling Order. The debtor's exclusive right to file a plan expires June 8, 2025; the Plan and Disclosure Statement are due October 6, 2025. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/10/2024. Status hearing to be held on 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (zlh)
December 10, 2024 Filing 18 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/15/2025 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 1/29/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/19/2025. (mlc)
December 10, 2024 Filing 17 General Notice. Event docketed: Generate notice. (related document:#6 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11.Trustee Scott S. Rever appointed to case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/8/2025 at 09:30 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 1/29/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/19/2025. (rah)). (dmc)
December 10, 2024 Filing 16 Document re: Resolutions Approving Filing of Amended Petition (related document:#13 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC) filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. (Silverman, Brett)
December 10, 2024 Filing 15 Document re: Bankruptcy Code Section 1116(1)(B) filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. (Silverman, Brett)
December 10, 2024 Filing 14 Amended Schedule(s) : D Fee Amount $ 34 filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. (Silverman, Brett)
December 10, 2024 Filing 13 Amended Schedule(s) : Other Schedules re:Volunatry Petition filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. (Silverman, Brett)
December 10, 2024 Filing 12 Document re: Resolutions Approving Bankruptcy Filing (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC) filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. (Silverman, Brett)
December 10, 2024 Filing 11 Document re: Rule 1007(a)(1) Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. (Silverman, Brett)
December 10, 2024 Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Set/Reset/Satisfied (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC, #19 Chapter 11 Small Business Scheduling Order). Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 10/6/2025.Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 6/8/2025. (dmc)
December 10, 2024 Trustee Scott S. Rever terminated, Reason: Case no longer a Subchapter V. (dmc) Modified on 12/10/2024 (dmc).
December 10, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)(# 24-21542-JKS) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47564938, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#14) (U.S. Treasury)
December 10, 2024 Subchapter V Deadline Terminated, Reason: case converted (dmc)
December 9, 2024 Filing 10 Motion for Relief from Stay re: 1442 44th Street, North Bergen, nj 07047. Fee Amount $ 199. Filed by Kenneth Borger Jr on behalf of Selene Finance LP, as Attorney in Fact for U.S. Bank Trust National Association not in its Individual Capacity but Solely as Owner Trustee for RCF 2 Acquisition Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Exhibits #3 Statement as to Why No Brief is Necessary #4 Proposed Order #5 Certificate of Service) (Borger, Kenneth)
December 9, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(# 24-21542-JKS) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47562630, fee amount $ 199.00. (re: Doc#10) (U.S. Treasury)
December 5, 2024 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
December 5, 2024 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
December 3, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing for: Subchapter V Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 2/18/2025. (Silverman, Brett) Modified to Correct Plan Due Deadline on 11/20/2024 . filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Section 1111(b) Election Deadline is no later than 14 days from the filing of the debtors plan. Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.Subchapter V Status Report Due By 1/21/2025: (zlh)
December 2, 2024 Filing 6 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11.Trustee Scott S. Rever appointed to case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/8/2025 at 09:30 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 1/29/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/19/2025. (rah) Modified on 12/10/2024 (dmc). DISREGARD. MEETING OF CREDITORS TO BE RE NOTICE.
December 2, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appointment of Scott S. Rever as Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee. U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Scott S. Rever) (United States Trustee, by Martha Hildebrandt, Assistant United States Trustee)
November 23, 2024 Filing 4 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/23/2024. (Admin.)
November 21, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David Gerardi on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Gerardi, David)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable) . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/21/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (dlr)
November 21, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition(# 24-21542) [caseupld,1405u] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47502375, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)
November 20, 2024 Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Set/Reset/Satisfied (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC, #13 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC). Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 9/16/2025.Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 5/19/2025. (dmc)
November 20, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Brett Silverman on behalf of DIA Investment Group LLC. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 9/16/2025.Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 5/19/2025 (Silverman, Brett) Modified to Correct Plan Due Deadline on 11/20/2024 (Heim, Robert). Modified to Correct Plan Due Deadline on 12/10/2024 (dmc).
November 20, 2024 Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Set/Reset/Satisfied (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor DIA Investment Group LLC). Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 2/18/2025. (rah)

Search for this case: DIA Investment Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: DIA Investment Group LLC
Represented By: Brett Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Scott S. Rever
Represented By: Scott S. Rever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: David Gerardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?