3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Debtor: 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2024bk21716
Filed: November 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Vincent F Papalia
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Hearing Held and Coninued from 1/23/2025 (related document: #7 Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference. Status Hearing scheduled for 03/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
January 7, 2025 Filing 25 Certificate of Service (related document:#5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, #18 Support filed by Debtor 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
December 22, 2024 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/22/2024. (Admin.)
December 22, 2024 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/22/2024. (Admin.)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Granting Application to Employ Scura, Wigfield, Heyer, Stevens & Cammarota, LLP as counsel for debtor (Related Doc #2). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/18/2024. (jf)
December 11, 2024 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/11/2024. (Admin.)
December 11, 2024 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/11/2024. (Admin.)
December 11, 2024 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (related document:#18 Support filed by Debtor 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
December 10, 2024 Filing 18 341 Meeting of Creditors Call-In Information in support of (related document:#5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
December 10, 2024 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David Gerardi on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Gerardi, David)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) List of Creditors (related document:#12 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/9/2024. (mlc)
December 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) E/F (related document:#11 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/9/2024. (mlc)
December 6, 2024 Filing 14 Certificate of Service (related document:#5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
December 6, 2024 Filing 13 Certificate of Service (related document:#11 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, #12 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
December 6, 2024 Filing 12 Amendment to List of Creditors Fee Amount $ 34. Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
December 6, 2024 Filing 11 Amended Schedule(s) : E/F,Summary of Schedules Fee Amount $ 34 filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
December 6, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors (Fee)(# 24-21716-VFP) [misc,amdcma] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47554486, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#12) (U.S. Treasury)
December 6, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)(# 24-21716-VFP) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47554433, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#11) (U.S. Treasury)
December 5, 2024 Filing 10 BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
December 5, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by David Edelberg on behalf of The City of Union City. (Edelberg, David)
December 4, 2024 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
December 3, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf)
December 2, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Service (related document:#5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
December 2, 2024 Filing 5 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/8/2025 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 2/4/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/27/2025. (mlc)
November 27, 2024 Filing 4 Supplemental Certification and Disclosure of Counsel in support of (related document:#2 Application for Retention filed by Debtor 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
November 26, 2024 Filing 3 Certificate of Service (related document:#2 Application for Retention filed by Debtor 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY) filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. (Stevens, David)
November 26, 2024 Filing 2 Application For Retention of Professional Scura, Wigfield, Heyer, Stevens & Cammarota, LLP as Counsel for Debtor Filed by David L. Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. Objections due by 12/17/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel #2 Proposed Order) (Stevens, David)
November 26, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition filed by David L. Stevens of Scura, Wigfield, Heyer & Stevens on behalf of 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/26/2025. (Stevens, David)
November 26, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition(# 24-21716) [caseupld,1405u] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47520141, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: 3125-3129 SUMMIT AVE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Represented By: David L. Stevens
Represented By: Scura, Mealey, Wigfield & Heyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: David Gerardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?