Kestespresso LLC
Debtor: Kestespresso LLC
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Trustee: Mark Politan
Case Number: 2:2024bk22019
Filed: December 5, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Vincent F Papalia
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2025 Filing 22 Document re: Notice of Telephonic 341 Meeting (related document:#7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. (Abelson, Steven)
January 12, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors (Fee)(# 24-22019-VFP) [misc,amdcma] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47673872, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#14) (U.S. Treasury)
January 10, 2025 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) List of Creditors (related document:#14 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor Kestespresso LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/7/2025. (mlc)
January 7, 2025 Filing 19 Balance Sheet filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. (Abelson, Steven)
January 7, 2025 Filing 18 Cash Flow Statement for Small Business filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. (Abelson, Steven)
January 7, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Satisfied (related document: #2 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), List of Equity Security Holders, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/6/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.) (mcp)
January 7, 2025 Remark(related document: #15 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Kestespresso LLC, #16 Statement of Operations filed by Debtor Kestespresso LLC, #17 Tax Information filed by Debtor Kestespresso LLC, #18 Cash Flow Statement filed by Debtor Kestespresso LLC, #19 Balance Sheet filed by Debtor Kestespresso LLC). No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (mlc)
January 6, 2025 Filing 17 Tax Information for the Year 2023 filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. (Abelson, Steven)
January 6, 2025 Filing 16 Statement of Operations for Small Business filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. (Abelson, Steven)
January 6, 2025 Filing 15 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H,I,J, filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. (Abelson, Steven)
January 6, 2025 Filing 14 Amendment to List of Creditors Fee Amount $ 34. Filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. (Abelson, Steven)
January 5, 2025 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/05/2025. (Admin.)
January 5, 2025 Filing 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service #2 Certification of Counsel #3 Proposed Order) (Abelson, Steven)
December 29, 2024 Filing 10 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/29/2024. (Admin.)
December 29, 2024 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/29/2024. (Admin.)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Granting Application to Employ Steven J. Abelson as counsel for debtor (Related Doc #6). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/27/2024. (jf)
December 27, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing for: Subchapter V Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 03/5/2025. filed by Debtor Kestespresso LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Section 1111(b) Election Deadline is no later than 14 days from the filing of the debtors plan. Hearing scheduled for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark.Subchapter V Status Report Due By 2/13/2025: (mcp)
December 27, 2024 Filing 7 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11.Trustee Mark Politan appointed to case. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/22/2025 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 2/13/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/3/2025. (dmc)
December 17, 2024 Filing 6 Application For Retention of Professional Steven J. Abelson, Esq. as Attorney for Debtor in Possession Filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. Objections due by 12/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service #2 Certification of Steven J Abelson, Esq. #3 Exhibit Retainer Agreement #4 Proposed Order) (Abelson, Steven)
December 10, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appointment of Mark Politan as Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee. U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Mark J. Politan) (United States Trustee, by Martha Hildebrandt, Assistant United States Trustee)
December 9, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran)
December 8, 2024 Filing 3 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), List of Equity Security Holders, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/6/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/7/2025 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (dlr)
December 6, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-22019) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47552261, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)
December 5, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Steven J. Abelson on behalf of Kestespresso LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 03/5/2025. (Abelson, Steven)

Search for this case: Kestespresso LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Kestespresso LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Fran B. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Mark Politan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?