New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC
Debtor: New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2025bk11370
Filed: February 10, 2025
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John K Sherwood
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order Granting Application to Employ Elementary Business Inc.as Accounting Consultant. (Related Doc #52). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/9/2025. (zlh)
April 8, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 4/8/2025. (related document:#8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC)Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2025 at 02:00 PM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
April 8, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 4/8/2025. (related document:#57 Notice of Hearing for: Objection to Retention Applications. (related document:#52 Application For Retention of Professional Elementary Business Inc. as Accounting Consultant to the Debtor Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. #54 Application For Retention of Professional Frier Levitt as Special Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. #56 Objection to Retention Applications filed by Carl J. Soranno on behalf of Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, John Callaghan, Anthony Festa, Casey Pierce, Anthony Scillia, Craig Wright. filed by Creditor Anthony Festa, Creditor Anthony Scillia, Creditor Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, Creditor Craig Wright, Creditor John Callaghan, Creditor Casey Pierce). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark..)Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2025 at 02:00 PM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
March 25, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 3/25/2025. (related document:#8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC)Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2025 at 02:00 PM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
March 25, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. (related document:#21 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/10/2025.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/3/2025 filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark..) Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order Granting Application to Employ SAUL EWING LLP as ATTORNEY TO DEBTOR (Related Doc #45). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/24/2025. (zlh)
March 23, 2025 Filing 60 BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/23/2025. (Admin.)
March 21, 2025 Filing 59 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 filed by Turner Falk on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit) (Falk, Turner)
March 21, 2025 Filing 58 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 filed by Turner Falk on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit) (Falk, Turner)
March 21, 2025 Filing 57 Notice of Hearing for: Objection to Retention Applications. (related document:#52 Application For Retention of Professional Elementary Business Inc. as Accounting Consultant to the Debtor Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. #54 Application For Retention of Professional Frier Levitt as Special Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. #56 Objection to Retention Applications filed by Carl J. Soranno on behalf of Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, John Callaghan, Anthony Festa, Casey Pierce, Anthony Scillia, Craig Wright. filed by Creditor Anthony Festa, Creditor Anthony Scillia, Creditor Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, Creditor Craig Wright, Creditor John Callaghan, Creditor Casey Pierce). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (zlh)
March 20, 2025 Filing 56 Objection to Retention Applications (related document:#52 Application For Retention of Professional Elementary Business Inc. as Accounting Consultant to the Debtor Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Objection deadline is 3/24/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support of Application # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #54 Application For Retention of Professional Frier Levitt as Special Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Objection deadline is 3/26/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support of Application for Retention # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Carl J. Soranno on behalf of Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, John Callaghan, Anthony Festa, Casey Pierce, Anthony Scillia, Craig Wright. (Soranno, Carl)
March 19, 2025 Filing 55 Certificate of Service (related document:#54 Application for Retention filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
March 19, 2025 Filing 54 Application For Retention of Professional Frier Levitt as Special Counsel to the Debtor Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Objection deadline is 3/26/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification in Support of Application for Retention #2 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
March 18, 2025 Filing 53 Certificate of Service (related document:#52 Application for Retention filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
March 17, 2025 Filing 52 Application For Retention of Professional Elementary Business Inc. as Accounting Consultant to the Debtor Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Objection deadline is 3/24/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification in Support of Application #2 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
March 17, 2025 Filing 51 Certificate of Service (related document:#45 Application for Retention filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #50 Clerk's Office Quality Control Message - Certification of Service) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
March 14, 2025 Filing 50 Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. (related document:#45 Application For Retention of Professional Saul Ewing LLP as Counsel to the Debtors Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Objection deadline is 3/19/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Professional in Support of Application for Retention of Professionals # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) (mff)
March 13, 2025 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Bruce J. Wisotsky on behalf of 622 Eagle Rock Avenue Realty, LLC. (Wisotsky, Bruce)
March 12, 2025 Filing 48 INTERIM ORDER EXCUSING THE REQUIREMENT TO APPOINT A PATIENT CARE OMBUDSMAN PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 333. (related document:#30 Motion re: for Entry of an Order Excusing Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/12/2025. (zlh)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a), 363(b), AND 503(b) FOR AUTHORITY TO (I) MAINTAIN, RENEW AND CONTINUE INSURANCE POLICIES AND PROGRAMS AND (II) HONOR ALL INSURANCE OBLIGATIONS. (Related Doc #31). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/12/2025. (zlh)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105, 366 PROHIBITING UTILITIES FROM ALTERING, REFUSING OR DISCONTINUING SERVICES ON ACCOUNT OF PREPETITION CLAIMS AND ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR DETERMINING REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL ADEQUATE ASSURANCE. (Related Doc #32). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/12/2025. (zlh)
March 12, 2025 Filing 45 Application For Retention of Professional Saul Ewing LLP as Counsel to the Debtors Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Objection deadline is 3/19/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Professional in Support of Application for Retention of Professionals #2 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
March 11, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 3/11/2025. (related document:#8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC)Hearing scheduled for 03/25/2025 at 02:00 PM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
March 11, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Matter To Be Decided on the Papers (related document:#32 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas, CFO of the Debtors #2 Exhibit A - Utility Companies #3 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) (mff)
March 11, 2025 Minute of Hearing, OUTCOME: Revised Order Submitted. (related document:#31 Motion re: for an order authorizing, but not directing, the Debtors to maintain, renew and continue their insurance policies and programs and honor all insurance obligations Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas, CFO for Debtors #2 Exhibit A - Insurance Policies #3 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) (mff)
March 11, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Interim Order Submitted. (related document:#30 Motion re: for Entry of an Order Excusing Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas, CFO of the Debtors #2 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
March 10, 2025 Filing 44 Document re: NOTICE OF AGENDA OF MATTERS SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON MARCH 11, 2025 filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
March 10, 2025 Filing 43 Document re: Letter Brief (related document:#5 Show Cause, #31 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 13-week Cash Flow) (Ravin, Stephen)
March 7, 2025 Filing 42 Limited Objection to (related document:#31 Motion re: for an order authorizing, but not directing, the Debtors to maintain, renew and continue their insurance policies and programs and honor all insurance obligations Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas, CFO for Debtors # 2 Exhibit A - Insurance Policies # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Carl J. Soranno on behalf of Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, John Callaghan, Anthony Festa, Casey Pierce, Anthony Scillia, Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter) (Soranno, Carl)
March 7, 2025 Filing 41 Response to (related document:#30 Motion re: for Entry of an Order Excusing Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas, CFO of the Debtors # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by U.S. Trustee. (United States Trustee by Peter J. D'Auria)
March 6, 2025 Filing 40 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
March 6, 2025 Filing 39 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
March 6, 2025 Filing 38 Document re: Notie re: Telephonic 341 Hearing (related document:#6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
March 6, 2025 Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (related document:#6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by U.S. Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Continued to 3/12/2025 at 03:00 PM at Telephonic. (UST Staff03)
March 5, 2025 Remark. STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (dmc)
March 4, 2025 Hearing Withdrawn- documents have been filed. (related document: #5 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/4/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark..) (mff)
March 4, 2025 Filing 37 Amended Schedule(s) : Other Schedules re:Form 202 - Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
March 4, 2025 Filing 36 Notice of Failure to File Supplemental Documents Concerning Schedules (related document:#28 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) (Browne, Christopher)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) List of Creditors (related document:#29 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/4/2025. (Browne, Christopher)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:#30 Motion re: for Entry of an Order Excusing Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #31 Motion re: for an order authorizing, but not directing, the Debtors to maintain, renew and continue their insurance policies and programs and honor all insurance obligations filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #32 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/28/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/11/2025 at 02:00 PM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (zlh)
February 28, 2025 Filing 33 Application to Shorten Time (related document:#30 Motion re: for Entry of an Order Excusing Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #31 Motion re: for an order authorizing, but not directing, the Debtors to maintain, renew and continue their insurance policies and programs and honor all insurance obligations filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #32 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 28, 2025 Filing 32 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas, CFO of the Debtors #2 Exhibit A - Utility Companies #3 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 28, 2025 Filing 31 Motion re: for an order authorizing, but not directing, the Debtors to maintain, renew and continue their insurance policies and programs and honor all insurance obligations Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas, CFO for Debtors #2 Exhibit A - Insurance Policies #3 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 28, 2025 Filing 30 Motion re: for Entry of an Order Excusing Appointment of a Patient Care Ombudsman Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas, CFO of the Debtors #2 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 27, 2025 Filing 29 Amended Schedule(s) : Other Schedules re:List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 27, 2025 Filing 28 Amendment to List of Creditors Fee Amount $ 34. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 27, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors (Fee)(# 25-11370-JKS) [misc,amdcma] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47855581, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#28) (U.S. Treasury)
February 26, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME:Consent Order to be submitted. Submissions for the Hearing on March 11, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. are due by 9:00 a.m. on Monday, March 10, 2025. (related document: #8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) Hearing scheduled for 03/11/2025 at 02:00 PM , JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
February 25, 2025 Filing 27 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Schedules, Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info - Individuals, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 24, 2025 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Paul DeMartino on behalf of Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, John Callaghan, Anthony Festa, Casey Pierce, Anthony Scillia, Craig Wright. (DeMartino, Paul)
February 21, 2025 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by U.S. Trustee. (United States Trustee by Peter J. D'Auria)
February 16, 2025 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
February 16, 2025 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
February 16, 2025 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
February 14, 2025 Filing 21 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/10/2025.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/3/2025 filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/25/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (zlh)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a), 363 AND 507(a) FOR AUTHORITY TO (I) PAY CERTAIN PREPETITION WAGES, SALARIES AND REIMBURSABLE EMPLOYEE EXPENSES; (II) PAY AND HONOR EMPLOYEE MEDICAL AND OTHER BENEFITS; (III) CONTINUE EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PROGRAMS; AND (IV) FOR RELATED RELIEF(related document:#8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/14/2025. (mff)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 25-11370 Member Cases: 25-11372 (Related Doc #7). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/14/2025. (mff)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105 AND 363 AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO CONTINUE USING EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND BUSINESS FORMS AND FOR RELATED RELIEF (Related Doc #9). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/14/2025. (mff)
February 13, 2025 Filing 17 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
February 13, 2025 Filing 16 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 41. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
February 13, 2025 Filing 15 Certificate of Service (related document:#7 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #8 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #9 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #10 Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #11 Order Expediting Consideration of First Day Matters) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 13, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Revised order to be submitted. (related document: #8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) Hearing scheduled for 02/26/2025 at 10:00 AM , JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark. (mff)
February 13, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted. Revised order to be Submitted. (related document: #7 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 25-11370 and 25-11372 Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) (mff)
February 13, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted. Revised order to be submitted. (related document: #9 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to continue using their existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms during the pendency of these chapter 11 cases Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) (mff)
February 12, 2025 Filing 14 Objection to (related document:#8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Carl J. Soranno on behalf of Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, John Callaghan, Anthony Festa, Casey Pierce, Anthony Scillia, Craig Wright. (Attachments: #1 Certification Declaration of Carl J. Soranno, Esq. #2 Exhibit Exhibits A - E) (Soranno, Carl)
February 12, 2025 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Stephen B. Ravin, Turner Falk on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Falk, Turner)
February 11, 2025 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Carl J. Soranno on behalf of Academy Orthopaedics, LLC, Casey Pierce, John Callaghan, Craig Wright, Anthony Scillia, Anthony Festa. (Soranno, Carl)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Granting Application for Expediting Consideration of First Day Matters (Related Doc #10). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 04:00 PM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (zlh)
February 11, 2025 Filing 10 Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters (related document:#7 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #8 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #9 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 11, 2025 Filing 9 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to continue using their existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms during the pendency of these chapter 11 cases Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 11, 2025 Filing 8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 11, 2025 Filing 7 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 25-11370 and 25-11372 Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 11, 2025 Filing 6 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 4/21/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/11/2025. (mlc)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/4/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (Browne, Christopher)
February 11, 2025 Hearing Scheduled. (related document:#7 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 25-11370 and 25-11372 Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. #8 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to (i) pay certain prepetition wages (and associated taxes) and reimbursable employee expenses, (ii) pay and honor employee medical and other benefits, (iii) continue employee benefit programs, and (iv) other related relief. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. #9 Motion re: Authorizing the Debtors to continue using their existing Bank Accounts and Business Forms during the pendency of these chapter 11 cases Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 04:00 PM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (zlh)
February 10, 2025 Filing 4 Adversary case 25-01036. Complaint by New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC, Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC against Anthony Festa, MD ; Anthony Scillia, MD ; Craig Wright, MD ; John Callaghan, MD ; Casey Pierce, MD ; Academy Orthopaedics, LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 10, 2025 Filing 3 Case Assignment. Judge John K. Sherwood added to the case. (rah)
February 10, 2025 Filing 2 Document re: Corporate Resolution to File Bankruptcy (related document:#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 10, 2025 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/10/2025.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/3/2025 (Ravin, Stephen)
February 10, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 25-11370) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47792436, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: New Jersey Orthopaedic Institute LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Ravin
Represented By: Saul Ewing LLP
Represented By: Turner Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?