Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC
Debtor: Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2025bk11372
Filed: February 10, 2025
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: John K Sherwood
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2025 Filing 25 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 filed by Turner Falk on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit) (Falk, Turner)
March 6, 2025 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
March 6, 2025 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/06/2025. (Admin.)
March 4, 2025 Hearing Withdrawn- documents have been filed. (related document: #8 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: 03/04/2025, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/4/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark..) (mff)
March 4, 2025 Filing 22 Amended Schedule(s) : Other Schedules re:Form 202 - Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
March 4, 2025 Filing 21 Notice of Failure to File Supplemental Documents Concerning Schedules (related document:#18 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC) (Browne, Christopher)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) List of Creditors (related document:#18 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/4/2025. (Browne, Christopher)
February 27, 2025 Filing 19 Amended Schedule(s) : Other Schedules re:List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 27, 2025 Filing 18 Amendment to List of Creditors Fee Amount $ 34. Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 27, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors (Fee)(# 25-11372-JKS) [misc,amdcma] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47855581, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#18) (U.S. Treasury)
February 26, 2025 Remark(related document: #17 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC). STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (Browne, Christopher)
February 25, 2025 Filing 17 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Schedules A/B,D, E/F, G & H filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen) Modified schedules on 2/27/2025 (Chrzanowski, Diane).
February 21, 2025 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by U.S. Trustee. (United States Trustee by Peter J. D'Auria)
February 16, 2025 Filing 15 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/16/2025. (Admin.)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 25-11370 Member Cases: 25-11372 (Related Doc #6). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/14/2025. (mff)
February 13, 2025 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
February 13, 2025 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
February 13, 2025 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
February 13, 2025 Filing 10 Certificate of Service (related document:#6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC, #7 Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters filed by Debtor Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 11, 2025 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Carl J. Soranno on behalf of Casey Pierce, John Callaghan, Craig Wright, Academy Orthopaedics LLC, Anthony Scillia, Anthony Festa. (Soranno, Carl)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: 03/04/2025, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/4/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (Browne, Christopher)
February 11, 2025 Filing 7 Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters (related document:#6 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC) Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 11, 2025 Filing 6 Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 25-11370 and 25-11372 Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kinga Skalska-Dybas in Support of First Day Relief #2 Proposed Order) (Ravin, Stephen)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark.. (Browne, Christopher)
February 11, 2025 Filing 4 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 4/21/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/11/2025. (mlc)
February 11, 2025 Hearing Withdrawn (related document:#5 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/11/2025. Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM, JKS - Courtroom 3D, Newark..) (Browne, Christopher)
February 10, 2025 Filing 3 Case Assignment. Judge John K. Sherwood added to the case. (rah)
February 10, 2025 Filing 2 Document re: Corporate Resolution to File Bankruptcy (related document:#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC) filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. (Ravin, Stephen)
February 10, 2025 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/10/2025.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/3/2025 (Ravin, Stephen)
February 10, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 25-11372) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47792579, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Northlands Orthopaedic Institute LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Ravin
Represented By: Turner Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?