PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC
Debtor: PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2025bk11669
Filed: February 19, 2025
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Stacey L Meisel
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 04/22/2025. (related document:#8 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 11:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark..)Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2025 at 11:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
April 9, 2025 Filing 24 Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 4/15/2025 at 11:00 AM. (related document:#8 Notice of Hearing -(Status Conference) (ntp)
April 9, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 4/10/2025. (related document:#8 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 11:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark..)Hearing scheduled for 04/15/2025 at 11:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
April 5, 2025 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
April 4, 2025 Hearing Withdrawn because Motion has been Withdrawn (related document:#16 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:failure to provide insurance, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7. Fee Amount EXEMPT. Filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law #2 Certification in support of Motion #3 Proposed Order dismissing case #4 Proposed Order converting case to chapter 7) Modified on 4/3/2025 (mrg). Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) (ntp)
April 4, 2025 Filing 22 Withdrawal of Document (related document:#16 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7, #18 Order on Application to Shorten Time) filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bierne, Savanna)
April 4, 2025 Filing 21 Amended Schedule(s) : A/B,Other Schedules re:Vountary filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. (Nisenson, Robert)
April 3, 2025 Filing 20 Response to (related document:#17 Application to Shorten Time (related document:#16 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:failure to provide insurance filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7. Fee Amount $ 15.) Filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order shortening time) filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. (Nisenson, Robert)
April 3, 2025 Filing 19 Certificate of Service (related document:#16 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7, #17 Application to Shorten Time filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, #18 Order on Application to Shorten Time) filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bierne, Savanna)
April 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:#16 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:failure to provide insurance filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7. Fee Amount $ 15.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/3/2025. Hearing scheduled for 4/3/2025 at 03:00 PM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.. (ntp)
April 3, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held; OUTCOME: Continued (related document:#16 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:failure to provide insurance, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7. Fee Amount EXEMPT. Filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law #2 Certification in support of Motion #3 Proposed Order dismissing case #4 Proposed Order converting case to chapter 7) Modified on 4/3/2025 (mrg). Filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2025 at 02:00 PM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
April 2, 2025 Filing 17 Application to Shorten Time (related document:#16 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:failure to provide insurance filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7. Fee Amount $ 15.) Filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order shortening time) (Bierne, Savanna)
April 2, 2025 Filing 16 **WITHDRAWN**Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:failure to provide insurance, or in the alternative Motion to Convert Case from Chapter 11 to Chapter 7. Fee Amount EXEMPT. Filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law #2 Certification in support of Motion #3 Proposed Order dismissing case #4 Proposed Order converting case to chapter 7) (Bierne, Savanna)Modified on 4/3/2025 (mrg).Modified on 4/7/2025 (Browne, Christopher).
April 2, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 4/8/2025. (related document:#8 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 11:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark..)Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2025 at 10:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
March 25, 2025 Filing 15 Certificate of Service (related document:#11 Order on Application For Retention) filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. (Nisenson, Robert)
March 21, 2025 Filing 14 Document re: Noticed Re: Telephone 341 Meeting of Creditors (related document:#3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. (Nisenson, Robert)
March 18, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Satisfied; Missing Documents Filed (related document:#4 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A/B,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/20/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2025 at 10:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark..) (omf)
March 17, 2025 Filing 13 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Attorney Signature(s), Declaration About An Individuals Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs For Individuals, Summary of Assets/Liabilities and Stat Info - Individuals A/B,C,G,H, filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. (Nisenson, Robert)
March 17, 2025 Remark(related document: #13 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC). STILL MISSING: No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (Browne, Christopher)
March 16, 2025 Filing 12 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/16/2025. (Admin.)
March 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Granting Application to Employ Robert C. Nisenson, Esq. as Attorney (Related Doc #2). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 3/14/2025. (ntp)
March 11, 2025 Filing 10 Response to (related document:#2 Application For Retention of Professional Robert C. Nisenson, Esq. as Attorney Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. Objections due by 3/12/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Debtor PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC) filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification) (Nisenson, Robert)
March 2, 2025 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/02/2025. (Admin.)
February 28, 2025 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 11:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.. (omf)
February 22, 2025 Filing 7 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
February 22, 2025 Filing 6 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/22/2025. (Admin.)
February 21, 2025 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Savanna Bierne on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bierne, Savanna)
February 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Schedules A/B,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 2/20/2025. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2025 at 10:00 AM, SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.. (Browne, Christopher)
February 20, 2025 Filing 3 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/26/2025 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 4/30/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/18/2025. (rah)
February 19, 2025 Filing 2 Application For Retention of Professional Robert C. Nisenson, Esq. as Attorney Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. Objections due by 3/12/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Proposed Order #3 Certificate of Service) (Nisenson, Robert)
February 19, 2025 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Robert C. Nisenson on behalf of PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 06/20/2025. (Nisenson, Robert)
February 19, 2025 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 25-11669) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47824953, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PPW Realty 1408-10 W 3rd St LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Nisenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Savanna Bierne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?