CG Jersey, Inc.
Debtor: CG Jersey, Inc.
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 3:2024bk21373
Filed: November 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Christine M Gravelle
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Filing 29 Certificate of Service (related document:#26 Response filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.) filed by Jessica M. Minneci on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Minneci, Jessica)
January 7, 2025 Filing 28 Withdrawal of Document (related document:#14 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, #26 Response filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.) filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Lieb, Samantha)
January 7, 2025 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Hochheiser, Alan)
January 6, 2025 Filing 26 Response to (related document:#14 Objection to Application for Retention of Professional (related document:#4 Application For Retention of Professional Middlebrooks Shapiro, PC as Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Fratello's Italian Restaurant. Objections due by 12/6/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.) filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee) filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
January 2, 2025 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/02/2025. (Admin.)
January 2, 2025 Filing 24 Certificate of Service (related document:#23 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s)or Document(s)) filed by Jessica M. Minneci on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Minneci, Jessica)
December 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) D (related document:#22 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/31/2024. (gan)
December 31, 2024 Filing 22 Amended Schedule(s) : A/B,D,Summary of Schedules Fee Amount $ 34 filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
December 31, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)(# 24-21373-CMG) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47634376, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#22) (U.S. Treasury)
December 12, 2024 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/12/2024. (Admin.)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) (related document:#15 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/10/2024. (gan)
December 10, 2024 Filing 19 Missing Document(s): Cash Flow Statement filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
December 10, 2024 Filing 18 Missing Document(s): Statement of Operations filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
December 10, 2024 Filing 17 Document re: Debtor's Redacted 2023 Tax Returns (related document:#8 Show Cause) filed by Joseph M. Shapiro on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Shapiro, Joseph)
December 10, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney)(# 24-21373-CMG) [misc,amdsch3a] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47566510, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#15) (U.S. Treasury)
December 10, 2024 Remark. No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (gan)
December 10, 2024 Fee Due Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) $ 34. (related document:#15 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Attorney Signature(s), Debtor(s) Signature(s), Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.) (gan)
December 10, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Vacated (related document: #8 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/18/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2024 at 11:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton.) (mjb)
December 9, 2024 Filing 16 Missing Document(s): Balance Sheet filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
December 9, 2024 Filing 15 Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Attorney Signature(s), Debtor(s) Signature(s), Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
December 6, 2024 Filing 14 Objection to Application for Retention of Professional (related document:#4 Application For Retention of Professional Middlebrooks Shapiro, PC as Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Fratello's Italian Restaurant. Objections due by 12/6/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.) filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Lieb, Samantha)
December 6, 2024 Hearing Scheduled on Objection to (related document:#4 Application For Retention of Professional Middlebrooks Shapiro, PC as Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Fratello's Italian Restaurant. (Attachments: # 1 Certification # 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 2:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (rms)
December 5, 2024 Filing 13 Document re: 341(a) Meeting Notice (related document:#5 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc.. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
December 2, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by K. Joseph Vyzas on behalf of Magyar Bank. (Vyzas, K.)
November 20, 2024 Filing 11 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/20/2024. (Admin.)
November 20, 2024 Filing 10 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/20/2024. (Admin.)
November 20, 2024 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 11/20/2024. (Admin.)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/18/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2024 at 11:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (gan)
November 18, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Fratello's Italian Restaurant. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 05/14/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 09/11/2025. filed by Debtor CG Jersey, Inc.). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/14/2025 at 2:00 PM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (rms)
November 18, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Lieb, Samantha)
November 18, 2024 Filing 5 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/19/2024 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 1/24/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/14/2025. (mrg)
November 15, 2024 Filing 4 Application For Retention of Professional Middlebrooks Shapiro, PC as Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Counsel Filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Fratello's Italian Restaurant. Objections due by 12/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Proposed Order #3 Certificate of Service) (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
November 15, 2024 Filing 3 Document re: Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Fratello's Italian Restaurant. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 Document re: Resolution of Board of Directors filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Fratello's Italian Restaurant. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
November 15, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Melinda D. Middlebrooks on behalf of CG Jersey, Inc. d/b/a Fratello's Italian Restaurant. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 05/14/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 09/11/2025. (Middlebrooks, Melinda)
November 15, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-21373) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47480871, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: CG Jersey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: CG Jersey, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph M. Shapiro
Represented By: Jessica M. Minneci
Represented By: Melinda D. Middlebrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Samantha Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?