M Design Village, LLC
Debtor: M Design Village, LLC
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 3:2024bk21406
Filed: November 18, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order Granting Application to Employ NLC Financial Services, LLC as Accountant (Related Doc #82). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/14/2025. (km)
January 13, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Final Order to be Submitted (related document: #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) (km)
January 13, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Final Order to be Submitted (related document: #37 INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION, TO CONTINUE USING EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND BUSINESS FORMS (related document:#8 Motion re: for Authority to Continue to Use its Existing Bank Accounts Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024.) (km)
January 13, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Final Order to be Submitted (related document: #39 INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING (I) THE CONTINUATION OF THE INSURANCE POLICIES OF M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION; (II) THE CONTINUATION OF THE DEBTORS INSURANCE PREMIUM FINANCING AGREEMENT; AND (III) THE PERFORMANCE OF ALL PREPETITION OBLIGATIONS RELATED THERETO (related document:#10 Motion re: for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (i) the Continuation of the Debtors Insurance Policies, (ii) the Continuation of the Debtors Premium Financing Agreement with First Insurance Funding and (iii) the Performance of All Pre-Petition Obligations Related Thereto Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024.) (km)
January 13, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Final Order to be Submitted (related document: #36 INTERIM ORDER (i) PROHIBITING UTILITY COMPANIES FROM DISCONTINUING, ALTERING OR REFUSING SERVICE, (ii) DEEMING UTILITY COMPANIES TO HAVE ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OFPAYMENT, AND (iii) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL ASSURANCE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 366 (related document:#7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024.) (km)
January 13, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Final Order to be Submitted (related document: #38 INTERIM ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION TO: (A) PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES AND RELATED OBLIGATIONS, (B) PAY AND REMIT PAYROLL TAXES AND OTHER DEDUCTIONS TO THIRD PARTIES, AND (C) HONOR AND PROCESS WORKERS COMPENSATION AND EMPLOYEE BENEFIT OBLIGATIONS, AND(II) AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING ALL BANKS TO HONOR CHECKS AND TRANSFERS FOR PAYMENT OF PRE-PETITION EMPLOYEE OBLIGATIONS (related document:#9 Motion re: (I) Authorizing the Debtor to: (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions and Related Obligations; (B) Pay and Remit Payroll Taxes and Other Deductions to Third Parties; and (C) Honor and Process Workers Compensation and Other Employee Benefit Obligations; and (II) Authorizing and Directing All Banks and Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay All Checks and Transfers drawn on the Debtors Bank Accounts for Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Obligations Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024.) (km)
January 7, 2025 Filing 83 Certificate of Service (related document:#82 Application for Retention filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
January 6, 2025 Filing 82 Application For Retention of Professional NLC Financial Services, LLC as Accountant Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Objection deadline is 1/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Proposed Order) (Dudas, Michele)
January 3, 2025 Filing 81 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by John Baranello on behalf of Interglobo Far East Ltd.. (Baranello, John)
January 2, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/9/25 (related document: #38 INTERIM ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION TO: (A) PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES AND RELATED OBLIGATIONS, (B) PAY AND REMIT PAYROLL TAXES AND OTHER DEDUCTIONS TO THIRD PARTIES, AND (C) HONOR AND PROCESS WORKERS COMPENSATION AND EMPLOYEE BENEFIT OBLIGATIONS, AND(II) AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING ALL BANKS TO HONOR CHECKS AND TRANSFERS FOR PAYMENT OF PRE-PETITION EMPLOYEE OBLIGATIONS (related document:#9 Motion re: (I) Authorizing the Debtor to: (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions and Related Obligations; (B) Pay and Remit Payroll Taxes and Other Deductions to Third Parties; and (C) Honor and Process Workers Compensation and Other Employee Benefit Obligations; and (II) Authorizing and Directing All Banks and Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay All Checks and Transfers drawn on the Debtors Bank Accounts for Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Obligations Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024.)Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
January 2, 2025 TEXT ORDER: In honor of the National Day of Mourning for President Carter, the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey will be closed on Thursday, January 9, 2025. Therefore, the hearings in this case scheduled for Thursday, January 9, 2025 will be rescheduled to MONDAY, JANUARY 13, 2025 AT 10:00 A.M. Signed on 1/2/2025. (km)
January 2, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/9/25 (related document: #36 INTERIM ORDER (i) PROHIBITING UTILITY COMPANIES FROM DISCONTINUING, ALTERING OR REFUSING SERVICE, (ii) DEEMING UTILITY COMPANIES TO HAVE ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OFPAYMENT, AND (iii) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL ASSURANCE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 366 (related document:#7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024.)Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
January 2, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/9/25 (related document: #39 INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING (I) THE CONTINUATION OF THE INSURANCE POLICIES OF M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION; (II) THE CONTINUATION OF THE DEBTORS INSURANCE PREMIUM FINANCING AGREEMENT; AND (III) THE PERFORMANCE OF ALL PREPETITION OBLIGATIONS RELATED THERETO (related document:#10 Motion re: for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (i) the Continuation of the Debtors Insurance Policies, (ii) the Continuation of the Debtors Premium Financing Agreement with First Insurance Funding and (iii) the Performance of All Pre-Petition Obligations Related Thereto Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024.)Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
January 2, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/9/25 (related document: #37 INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION, TO CONTINUE USING EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND BUSINESS FORMS (related document:#8 Motion re: for Authority to Continue to Use its Existing Bank Accounts Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024.)Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
January 2, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/9/25 (related document: #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC)Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
December 28, 2024 Filing 80 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/28/2024. (Admin.)
December 26, 2024 Filing 79 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER REGARDING GLOBAL RESOLUTION BETWEEN M DESIGN, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-INPOSSESSION, RBLX FUNDING, LLC AND MERK FUNDING, INC., (related document:#78 Certification Concerning Proposed Order filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Filed by Michele M. Dudas , Harry M. Gutfleish . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/26/2024. (km)
December 23, 2024 Filing 78 Certification Concerning Proposed Order (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #16 Objection to Debtor's use of cash collateral and proposed factoring arrangement (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of RBLX Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement # 2 Exhibit B - UCC) filed by Creditor RBLX Funding, LLC, #22 Objection to Debtor's use of cash collateral and proposed factoring agreement (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement # 2 Exhibit B - UCC) filed by Interested Party Merk Funding, Inc.). Hearing set for December 23, 2024. Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed Stipulation and Consent Order) (Dudas, Michele)
December 19, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/19/24 (related document: #15 Notice of Hearing for: CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/18/2025. filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2024 at 02:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton.)Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2025 at 02:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
December 19, 2024 Final Hearing Scheduled. (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/9/2025 at 11:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (dmi)
December 17, 2024 Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#77 Withdrawal of document filed by Creditor 701 Cottontail Lane Associates, LLC). Type of Error: Letter Withdrawing Missing, filed by Frank Velocci. Please correct and refile with the court. (wdr)
December 16, 2024 Filing 77 Withdrawal of Document (related document:#72 Motion to Compel Payment of Administrative Expenses filed by Creditor 701 Cottontail Lane Associates, LLC) filed by Frank F. Velocci on behalf of 701 Cottontail Lane Associates, LLC. (Velocci, Frank) FILING ERROR- LETTER WITHDRAWING MISSING Modified on 12/17/2024 (wdr).
December 16, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Settled (related document: #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) (km)
December 16, 2024 Text Order: The Court issues this Text Order to advise that the Chapter 11 Status Conference scheduled for Thursday, December 19, 2024 will be adjourned to THURSDAY, JANUARY 30, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. Please mark your calendars accordingly. Signed on 12/16/2024. (km)
December 14, 2024 Filing 76 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
December 14, 2024 Filing 75 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/14/2024. (Admin.)
December 14, 2024 Filing 74 Document re: Letter to Creditors and Parties-in-Interest Providing Dial-In Information for Meeting of Creditors Scheduled for December 19, 2024, at 12:00 p.m. (related document:#17 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
December 13, 2024 Filing 73 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/13/2024. (Admin.)
December 13, 2024 Filing 72 Motion to Compel Payment of Administrative Expenses Filed by Frank F. Velocci on behalf of 701 Cottontail Lane Associates, LLC. (Velocci, Frank)
December 13, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/23/24 (related document: #5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC)Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (dmi)
December 12, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Withdrawn (related document: #3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/18/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton.) (km)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Shanna M. Kaminski, Esq as Special Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc #60). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 12/12/2024. (km)
December 12, 2024 Filing 70 INTERIM ORDER: (I) AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION, USE OF CASH COLLATERAL PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105, 363(c)(2)(B), 363(e), 507(b), FED. R. BANKR. P. 4001(b), AND D.N.J. L.B.R. 4001-4; (II) TO ENTER INTO FACTORING ARRANGEMENT WITH VERSANT FUNDING LLC (i) TO SELL CERTAIN ACCOUNTS RECEIVABLE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 363(b) AND (f), AND (ii) TO GRANT VERSANT FUNDING LLC SECURITY INTERESTS AND CLAIMS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 364(c) AND (d), AND (III) TO SCHEDULE A FINAL HEARING ON THE MATTERS(related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/12/2024. (dmi)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order Granting Application to Employ Professional McManimon, Scotland & Baumann, LLC as Counsel to Debtor (Related Doc #14). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/11/2024. (rms)
December 11, 2024 Filing 68 Transcript regarding Hearing Held 12/05/24 (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d)). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/18/2024. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 01/2/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 01/13/2025. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 03/11/2025. (J&J Court Transcribers)
December 10, 2024 Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of $250.00. Receipt Number 51185. (related document:#59 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice). (rah)
December 6, 2024 Filing 67 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/06/2024. (Admin.)
December 6, 2024 Filing 66 Certificate of Service (related document:#17 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11, #45 Support filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #54 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s)or Document(s)) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
December 5, 2024 Filing 65 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/05/2024. (Admin.)
December 5, 2024 Hearing Rescheduled from 12/5/24 (related document: #5 FINAL Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC)Hearing scheduled for 12/23/2024 at 09:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton & Revised Order to be Submitted. (km)
December 5, 2024 Filing 64 Amended Certificate of Service (related document:#60 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Unknown Role Type RBLX Funding, LLC, Interested Party Merk Funding, Inc.) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc., RBLX Funding, LLC. (Gutfleish, Harry)
December 5, 2024 Filing 63 Certificate of Service (related document:#60 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Unknown Role Type RBLX Funding, LLC, Interested Party Merk Funding, Inc.) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc., RBLX Funding, LLC. FILING ERROR- /S. SIGNATURE MISSING (Gutfleish, Harry) Modified on 12/5/2024 (wdr).
December 5, 2024 Filing 62 Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. (related document:#60 Application for Attorney Shanna M. Kaminski, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc., RBLX Funding, LLC. Objection deadline is 12/11/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Shanna Kaminski # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Unknown Role Type RBLX Funding, LLC, Interested Party Merk Funding, Inc.) (km)
December 5, 2024 Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:#63 Certificate of Service filed by Unknown Role Type RBLX Funding, LLC, Interested Party Merk Funding, Inc.). Type of Error: /s/ Signature Missing, filed by Harry M Gutfleish. Please correct and refile with the court. (wdr)
December 4, 2024 Filing 61 Adversary case 24-01639. Complaint by M Design Village, LLC against Versant Funding LLC ; United States Small Business Administration ; Cloudfund LLC ; Samson MCA LLC ; 7even Capital, LLC ; Dual Capital, LLC ; Merk Funding, Inc. ; RBLX Funding, LLC. Fee Amount $ 350.. Nature of Suits:(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property),91 (Declaratory judgment),72 (Injunctive relief - other),12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference),81 (Subordination of claim or interest)), (Dudas, Michele)
December 4, 2024 Filing 60 Application for Attorney Shanna M. Kaminski, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc., RBLX Funding, LLC. Objection deadline is 12/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shanna Kaminski #2 Proposed Order) (Gutfleish, Harry)
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Robert L. Rattet, Esq as Special Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc #33). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 12/4/2024. (km) Modified on 12/10/2024 (Heim, Robert). Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of $250.00. Receipt Number 51185.
December 4, 2024 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc., RBLX Funding, LLC. (Gutfleish, Harry)
December 3, 2024 Filing 57 Response to (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Terri Jane Freedman on behalf of Versant Funding LLC. (Freedman, Terri)
December 3, 2024 Filing 56 Document re: Letter Brief in response to Court's direction and in advance of the December 5, 2024 hearing filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc., RBLX Funding, LLC. (Gutfleish, Harry)
December 3, 2024 Filing 55 Document re: Debtor's Position on December 18, 2024 Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Motion for Use of Cash Collateral and DIP Financing (related document: Hearing (Document) Scheduled) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order Respecting Amendment to Schedule(s) List of Creditors (related document:#44 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/3/2024. (wdr)
December 3, 2024 Remark. No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (wdr)
November 29, 2024 Filing 53 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/29/2024. (Admin.)
November 28, 2024 Filing 52 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
November 28, 2024 Filing 51 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
November 28, 2024 Filing 50 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
November 28, 2024 Filing 49 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
November 28, 2024 Filing 48 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
November 27, 2024 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Christianson, Shawn)
November 27, 2024 Filing 46 AMENDED INTERIM ORDER (I) DIRECTING CERTAIN VENDORS OF M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-INPOSSESSION,BE DESIGNATED AS CRITICAL VENDORS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a); AND (II) AUTHORIZING, BUT NOT DIRECTING,PAYMENT TO CRITICAL VENDORS (related document:#6 Motion re: (I) Directing Certain Vendors of the Debtor to be Designated as Critical Vendors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and (II) Authorizing, But Not Directing, Payment to Critical Vendors filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/27/2024. (km)
November 27, 2024 Filing 45 Refiled to Include Executed Signature Page in support of (related document:#44 Amended List of Creditors (Fee) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Sodono, Anthony)
November 27, 2024 Filing 44 Amendment to List of Creditors Fee Amount $ 34. Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Sodono, Anthony)
November 27, 2024 Filing 43 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Sodono, Anthony)
November 27, 2024 Filing 42 Document re: Certification of Munir Hussain in Support of Entry of Amended Interim Order Designating Mainfreight Inc. as Critical Vendor and Granting Related Relief (related document:#6 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
November 27, 2024 Filing 41 Missing Document(s): List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,C,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Sodono, Anthony)
November 27, 2024 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Kevin M. Capuzzi on behalf of Mainfreight, Inc.. (Capuzzi, Kevin)
November 27, 2024 Hearing Scheduled. (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/5/2024 at 03:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (dmi)
November 27, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Amended List of Creditors (Fee)(# 24-21406-MEH) [misc,amdcma] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47525450, fee amount $ 34.00. (re: Doc#44) (U.S. Treasury)
November 26, 2024 Filing 39 INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING (I) THE CONTINUATION OF THE INSURANCE POLICIES OF M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION; (II) THE CONTINUATION OF THE DEBTORS INSURANCE PREMIUM FINANCING AGREEMENT; AND (III) THE PERFORMANCE OF ALL PREPETITION OBLIGATIONS RELATED THERETO (related document:#10 Motion re: for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (i) the Continuation of the Debtors Insurance Policies, (ii) the Continuation of the Debtors Premium Financing Agreement with First Insurance Funding and (iii) the Performance of All Pre-Petition Obligations Related Thereto Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi)
November 26, 2024 Filing 38 INTERIM ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION TO: (A) PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES AND RELATED OBLIGATIONS, (B) PAY AND REMIT PAYROLL TAXES AND OTHER DEDUCTIONS TO THIRD PARTIES, AND (C) HONOR AND PROCESS WORKERS COMPENSATION AND EMPLOYEE BENEFIT OBLIGATIONS, AND(II) AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING ALL BANKS TO HONOR CHECKS AND TRANSFERS FOR PAYMENT OF PRE-PETITION EMPLOYEE OBLIGATIONS (related document:#9 Motion re: (I) Authorizing the Debtor to: (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions and Related Obligations; (B) Pay and Remit Payroll Taxes and Other Deductions to Third Parties; and (C) Honor and Process Workers Compensation and Other Employee Benefit Obligations; and (II) Authorizing and Directing All Banks and Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay All Checks and Transfers drawn on the Debtors Bank Accounts for Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Obligations Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi)
November 26, 2024 Filing 37 INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION, TO CONTINUE USING EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND BUSINESS FORMS (related document:#8 Motion re: for Authority to Continue to Use its Existing Bank Accounts Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi)
November 26, 2024 Filing 36 INTERIM ORDER (i) PROHIBITING UTILITY COMPANIES FROM DISCONTINUING, ALTERING OR REFUSING SERVICE, (ii) DEEMING UTILITY COMPANIES TO HAVE ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OFPAYMENT, AND (iii) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL ASSURANCE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 366 (related document:#7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi)
November 26, 2024 Filing 35 INTERIM ORDER (I) DIRECTING CERTAIN VENDORS OF M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION, BE DESIGNATED AS CRITICAL VENDORS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a); AND (II) AUTHORIZING, BUT NOT DIRECTING, PAYMENT TOCRITICAL VENDORS (Related Doc #6). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi)
November 26, 2024 Filing 33 Application for Attorney Robert L. Rattet, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Terri Jane Freedman on behalf of Versant Funding LLC. Objection deadline is 12/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Terri Jane Freedman, Esq. #2 Certification of Robert L. Rattet, Esq. #3 Proposed Order) (Freedman, Terri)
November 26, 2024 Filing 32 Notice of Hearing for: Evidentiary Hearing (if necessary). (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km) Modified on 11/26/2024: PLEASE DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR. THE COURT WILL SET CORRECT HEARING (Jackson, Bruce).
November 26, 2024 FINAL Hearing Scheduled. (related document:#36 INTERIM ORDER (i) PROHIBITING UTILITY COMPANIES FROM DISCONTINUING, ALTERING OR REFUSING SERVICE, (ii) DEEMING UTILITY COMPANIES TO HAVE ADEQUATE ASSURANCE OFPAYMENT, AND (iii) ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING REQUESTS FOR ADDITIONAL ASSURANCE PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 105(a) AND 366 (related document:#7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi), #37 INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION, TO CONTINUE USING EXISTING BANK ACCOUNTS AND BUSINESS FORMS (related document:#8 Motion re: for Authority to Continue to Use its Existing Bank Accounts Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi), #38 INTERIM ORDER (I) AUTHORIZING M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION TO: (A) PAY PRE-PETITION WAGES AND RELATED OBLIGATIONS, (B) PAY AND REMIT PAYROLL TAXES AND OTHER DEDUCTIONS TO THIRD PARTIES, AND (C) HONOR AND PROCESS WORKERS COMPENSATION AND EMPLOYEE BENEFIT OBLIGATIONS, AND(II) AUTHORIZING AND DIRECTING ALL BANKS TO HONOR CHECKS AND TRANSFERS FOR PAYMENT OF PRE-PETITION EMPLOYEE OBLIGATIONS (related document:#9 Motion re: (I) Authorizing the Debtor to: (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions and Related Obligations; (B) Pay and Remit Payroll Taxes and Other Deductions to Third Parties; and (C) Honor and Process Workers Compensation and Other Employee Benefit Obligations; and (II) Authorizing and Directing All Banks and Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay All Checks and Transfers drawn on the Debtors Bank Accounts for Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Obligations Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi), #39 INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING (I) THE CONTINUATION OF THE INSURANCE POLICIES OF M DESIGN VILLAGE, LLC, CHAPTER 11 DEBTOR AND DEBTOR-IN-POSSESSION; (II) THE CONTINUATION OF THE DEBTORS INSURANCE PREMIUM FINANCING AGREEMENT; AND (III) THE PERFORMANCE OF ALL PREPETITION OBLIGATIONS RELATED THERETO (related document:#10 Motion re: for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (i) the Continuation of the Debtors Insurance Policies, (ii) the Continuation of the Debtors Premium Financing Agreement with First Insurance Funding and (iii) the Performance of All Pre-Petition Obligations Related Thereto Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. (dmi)) Hearing scheduled for 1/9/2025 at 11:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (dmi)
November 25, 2024 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Terri Jane Freedman on behalf of Versant Funding LLC. (Freedman, Terri)
November 23, 2024 Filing 30 BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/23/2024. (Admin.)
November 23, 2024 Filing 29 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 55. Notice Date 11/23/2024. (Admin.)
November 22, 2024 Filing 28 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/22/2024. (Admin.)
November 22, 2024 Filing 27 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/22/2024. (Admin.)
November 22, 2024 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Frank F. Velocci on behalf of 701 Cottontail Lane Associates, LLC. (Velocci, Frank)
November 22, 2024 Filing 25 Response to (related document:#16 Objection to Debtor's use of cash collateral and proposed factoring arrangement (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of RBLX Funding, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement # 2 Exhibit B - UCC) filed by Unknown Role Type RBLX Funding, LLC, #22 Objection to Debtor's use of cash collateral and proposed factoring agreement (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreement # 2 Exhibit B - UCC) filed by Interested Party Merk Funding, Inc.) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
November 22, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Revised Order to be Submitted (related document:#10 Motion re: for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (i) the Continuation of the Debtors Insurance Policies, (ii) the Continuation of the Debtors Premium Financing Agreement with First Insurance Funding and (iii) the Performance of All Pre-Petition Obligations Related Thereto Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order #2 proposed Final Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) (km)
November 22, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Revised Order to be Submitted (related document:#6 Motion re: (I) Directing Certain Vendors of the Debtor to be Designated as Critical Vendors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and (II) Authorizing, But Not Directing, Payment to Critical Vendors Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) (km)
November 22, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Revised Order to be Submitted (related document:#8 Motion re: for Authority to Continue to Use its Existing Bank Accounts Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) (km)
November 22, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Revised Order to be Submitted (related document:#9 Motion re: (I) Authorizing the Debtor to: (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions and Related Obligations; (B) Pay and Remit Payroll Taxes and Other Deductions to Third Parties; and (C) Honor and Process Workers Compensation and Other Employee Benefit Obligations; and (II) Authorizing and Directing All Banks and Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay All Checks and Transfers drawn on the Debtors Bank Accounts for Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Obligations Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order #2 proposed Final Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) (km)
November 22, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Revised Order to be Submitted (related document:#7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order #2 proposed Final Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) (km)
November 22, 2024 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Revised Order to be Submitted (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order) Filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) (km)
November 21, 2024 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/21/2024. (Admin.)
November 21, 2024 Filing 23 Certificate of Service (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d), #6 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #8 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #9 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #10 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #11 Support filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #13 Order (Generic)) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
November 21, 2024 Filing 22 Objection to Debtor's use of cash collateral and proposed factoring agreement (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of Merk Funding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement #2 Exhibit B - UCC) (Gutfleish, Harry)
November 21, 2024 Filing 21 Hearing Rescheduled from 11/22/24 at 10 am.**ALL FIRST DAY MATTERS MOTIONS HAVE BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 11/22/24 AT 11:00 AM** (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #6 Motion re: (I) Directing Certain Vendors of the Debtor to be Designated as Critical Vendors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and (II) Authorizing, But Not Directing, Payment to Critical Vendors Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC.(Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #8 Motion re: for Authority to Continue to Use its Existing Bank Accounts Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #9 Motion re: (I) Authorizing the Debtor to: (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions and Related Obligations; (B) Pay and Remit Payroll Taxes and Other Deductions to Third Parties; and (C) Honor and Process Workers Compensation and Other Employee Benefit Obligations; and (II) Authorizing and Directing All Banks and Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay All Checks and Transfers drawn on the Debtors Bank Accounts for Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Obligations Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #10 Motion re: for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (i) the Continuation of the Debtors Insurance Policies, (ii) the Continuation of the Debtors Premium Financing Agreement with First Insurance Funding and (iii) the Performance of All Pre-Petition Obligations Related Thereto Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order # 2 proposed Final Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 11:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km) **ALL FIRST DAY MATTERS MOTIONS HAVE BEEN RESCHEDULED TO 11/22/24 AT 11:00 AM**
November 21, 2024 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Glucksman, James)
November 21, 2024 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice.. (Rattet, Robert)
November 21, 2024 Filing 18 Certificate of Service (related document:#14 Application for Retention filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
November 21, 2024 Filing 17 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/19/2024 at 12:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 1/27/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/19/2025. (mrg)
November 21, 2024 Filing 16 Objection to Debtor's use of cash collateral and proposed factoring arrangement (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Interim Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Harry M. Gutfleish on behalf of RBLX Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement #2 Exhibit B - UCC) (Gutfleish, Harry)
November 20, 2024 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing for: CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/18/2025. filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2024 at 02:00 PM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (km)
November 20, 2024 Filing 14 Application For Retention of Professional McManimon, Scotland & Baumann, LLC as Counsel to Debtor Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Objections due by 12/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Proposed Order) (Sodono, Anthony)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF FIRST DAY MATTERS (related document:#12 Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d), #6 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #8 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #9 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #10 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #11 Support filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/20/2024. (km)
November 19, 2024 Filing 12 Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d), #6 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #8 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #9 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #10 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #11 Support filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dudas, Michele)
November 19, 2024 Filing 11 Declaration of Munir Hussain, Chief Executive Officer and Manager, in Support of First Day Motions in support of (related document:#5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d), #6 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #8 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #9 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC, #10 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor M Design Village, LLC) filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
November 19, 2024 Filing 10 Motion re: for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing (i) the Continuation of the Debtors Insurance Policies, (ii) the Continuation of the Debtors Premium Financing Agreement with First Insurance Funding and (iii) the Performance of All Pre-Petition Obligations Related Thereto Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order #2 proposed Final Order) (Dudas, Michele)
November 19, 2024 Filing 9 Motion re: (I) Authorizing the Debtor to: (A) Pay Pre-Petition Wages, Salaries, Commissions and Related Obligations; (B) Pay and Remit Payroll Taxes and Other Deductions to Third Parties; and (C) Honor and Process Workers Compensation and Other Employee Benefit Obligations; and (II) Authorizing and Directing All Banks and Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor and Pay All Checks and Transfers drawn on the Debtors Bank Accounts for Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Obligations Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order #2 proposed Final Order) (Dudas, Michele)
November 19, 2024 Filing 8 Motion re: for Authority to Continue to Use its Existing Bank Accounts Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order) (Dudas, Michele)
November 19, 2024 Filing 7 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order #2 proposed Final Order) (Dudas, Michele)
November 19, 2024 Filing 6 Motion re: (I) Directing Certain Vendors of the Debtor to be Designated as Critical Vendors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105(a) and (II) Authorizing, But Not Directing, Payment to Critical Vendors Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dudas, Michele)
November 19, 2024 Filing 5 Motion to Use Cash Collateral, in addition to Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (Attachments: #1 proposed Interim Order) (Dudas, Michele)
November 19, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/18/2024. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 11:00 AM at MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton. (wdr)
November 18, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michele M. Dudas on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. (Dudas, Michele)
November 18, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Anthony Sodono III on behalf of M Design Village, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/18/2025. (Sodono, Anthony)
November 18, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-21406) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47485197, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: M Design Village, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: M Design Village, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Sodono, III
Represented By: Michele M. Dudas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Lauren Bielskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?