58 Ocean Avenue LLC
Debtor: 58 Ocean Avenue LLC
U.S. Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 3:2024bk21708
Filed: November 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Michael B Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Filing 20 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/23/2025. (Admin.)
January 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Granting Application For Retention of Professional Scott J. Goldstein as Special Counsel (Related Doc #18). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/21/2025. (dmi)
January 10, 2025 Filing 18 Application For Retention of Professional Scott J. Goldstein as Special Counsel Filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. Objection deadline is 1/17/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification #2 Proposed Order #3 Certificate of Service) (Goldstein, Scott)
January 10, 2025 Filing 17 Status Report (related document:#3 Notice of Hearing (Upload)) filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. (Goldstein, Scott)
January 10, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/10/25 (related document: #3 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/26/2025. filed by Debtor 58 Ocean Avenue LLC). Hearing scheduled for 1/2/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.)Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (km)
January 9, 2025 Filing 16 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. (Goldstein, Scott)
January 9, 2025 Filing 15 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. (Goldstein, Scott)
January 6, 2025 Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Withdrawn; All Documents Filed (related document: #5 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: List of Equity Security Holders . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.) (mjb)
January 2, 2025 Hearing Rescheduled from 1/2/25 (related document: #3 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/26/2025. filed by Debtor 58 Ocean Avenue LLC). Hearing scheduled for 1/2/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.) Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (bwj)
December 27, 2024 Filing 14 Document re: Notice Regarding Telephonic 341 Meeting (related document:#2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. (Goldstein, Scott)
December 17, 2024 Remark - The Debtor's address of principal place of business is 58 Ocean Ave,Deal, NJ 07723-1330 . (mmf)
December 16, 2024 Filing 13 Document re: Amended Petition (related document:#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 58 Ocean Avenue LLC) filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. (Goldstein, Scott)
December 4, 2024 Filing 12 Missing Document(s): List of Equity Security Holders filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. (Goldstein, Scott)
December 4, 2024 Remark No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (wdr)
December 3, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Aladekemi Omoregie on behalf of Fifty Eight Ocean Ave LLC. (Omoregie, Aladekemi)
December 3, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Edward D Altabet on behalf of Fifty Eight Ocean Ave LLC. (Altabet, Edward)
November 29, 2024 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/29/2024. (Admin.)
November 29, 2024 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/29/2024. (Admin.)
November 29, 2024 Filing 7 BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 11/29/2024. (Admin.)
November 27, 2024 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Beginning on February 2, 2023, Judge Kaplan's regular Thursday motion calendar (addressing Chapter 7 & 11 cases) will utilize ZOOM for remote appearances. Parties remain free to request in-person appearances by contacting Chambers and the Court may direct same if, in the Court's discretion, in-person appearances are appropriate. Otherwise, remote appearances will be conducted via ZOOM ONLY. Please find the Zoom link on Judge Kaplan's page on the Court's website: http://www.njb.uscourts.gov/content/honorable-michael-b-kaplan. To appear via Zoom, parties may click on the Zoom link on the website or use a telephone to dial-in using the dial-in information. Please visit Judge Kaplan's page on the Court's website for further information regarding appearances, including the Court's Zoom appearance guidelines. (wdr)
November 27, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Samantha Lieb on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Lieb, Samantha)
November 27, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Hearing for: Status Conference. (related document:#1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/26/2025. filed by Debtor 58 Ocean Avenue LLC). Hearing scheduled for 1/2/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (dmi)
November 27, 2024 Filing 2 Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/2/2025 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 2/4/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 5/27/2025. (llb)
November 27, 2024 Remark Debtor has previous case 17-33757 MBK . (wdr)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: List of Equity Security Holders . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/26/2024. Hearing scheduled for 1/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wdr)
November 26, 2024 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Scott J. Goldstein on behalf of 58 Ocean Avenue LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 03/26/2025. (Goldstein, Scott)
November 26, 2024 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 24-21708) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47519155, fee amount $ 1738.00. (re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: 58 Ocean Avenue LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: 58 Ocean Avenue LLC
Represented By: Scott J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
U.s. trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Samantha Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?