AVAYA INC. v. TELECOM LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AVAYA INC.
Defendant: TELECOM LABS, INC., TEAMTLI.COM CORP., CONTINUANT, INC., SCOTT GRAHAM, DOUGLAS GRAHAM and BRUCE SHELBY
Counter_claimant: TELECOM LABS, INC., TEAMTLI.COM CORP. and CONTINUANT, INC.
Counter_defendant: AVAYA INC.
Case Number: 1:2006cv02490
Filed: June 2, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Somerset
Presiding Judge: Joseph E. Irenas
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1498 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/23/2016. (TH, )
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1496 MEMORANDUM OPINION FOR PAYMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER'S COMPENSATION AND COSTS. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/22/2016. (TH, )
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 1/19/2016. (TH, )
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 6/30/2014. (drw)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 1/7/2014. (TH, )
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 504 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 7/6/2012. (dmr)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 482 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 4/26/2012. (TH, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVAYA INC. v. TELECOM LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVAYA INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINE SIMPSON BAXTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELECOM LABS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEAMTLI.COM CORP.
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINUANT, INC.
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT GRAHAM
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS GRAHAM
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE SHELBY
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TELECOM LABS, INC.
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TEAMTLI.COM CORP.
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: CONTINUANT, INC.
Represented By: DAVID S. KWON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: AVAYA INC.
Represented By: TREVOR J. COONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?