VIBRA-TECH ENGINEERS, INC. v. KAVALEK et al
Plaintiff: VIBRA-TECH ENGINEERS, INC.
Defendant: SCOTT KAVALEK, ROBERTA KAVALEK, INTERGRATED GEOTECHNICAL SOLUTIONS, INC. and GEOTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC
Case Number: 1:2008cv02646
Filed: May 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Burlington
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 OPINION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 52(a)(1). Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 3/29/2012. (dmr) Modified on 3/29/2012 (dmr, ).
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDERED that Integrated Geotechnical Solutions, Inc. and Roberta Kavalek's 204 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 12/22/2011. (drw, )
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 AMENDED OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/14/2011. (drw, )
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/13/11. (js)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VIBRA-TECH ENGINEERS, INC. v. KAVALEK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIBRA-TECH ENGINEERS, INC.
Represented By: JOHN JOSEPH MASTER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT KAVALEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTA KAVALEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERGRATED GEOTECHNICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOTECH INSTRUMENTS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?