THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC. v. HOEY et al
Plaintiff: THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC. and Salomon Smith Barney Inc.)
Defendant: JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC and ROBERT W. HOEY
Case Number: 1:2009cv00255
Filed: January 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Burlington
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2010 ***Civil Case Terminated. (js)
May 13, 2010 Filing 41 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice & without Costs by ROBERT W. HOEY. (ZARETSKY, MICHAEL)
August 18, 2009 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Status Hearing held on 8/18/2009. (Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner) (js)
August 6, 2009 Reset Hearing: Status Hearing reset for 8/18/2009 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (gn)
July 30, 2009 Filing 39 Letter from Joseph E. Gehring, Jr.. (GEHRING, JOSEPH)
June 26, 2009 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Hearing set for 8/7/2009 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (gn )
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/19/09. (js)
June 2, 2009 Filing 37 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/20/2009, before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen J. Daner, Telephone number 609-393-3001. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2009. (nf, )
May 20, 2009 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Status Conference held on 5/20/2009. Re: Referral to the office of the US Attorney. Pltf counsel to submit consent order. Ordered status hearing set for 8/7/09 @ 11:00 am. (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen J. Daner.) (th, ) Modified on 6/9/2009 (dmr, ).
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 LETTER ORDER Granting request by Thomas B. Lewis, Esq. for an extension till 5/20/09. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/13/09. (js)
April 16, 2009 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/20/2009 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (gn)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER, IT Acceleration is enjoined from any further manipulation of the devices, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 4/1/09. (js)
March 23, 2009 Filing 33 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/16/2009, before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen J. Daner, Telephone number 609-393-3001. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2009. (nf, )
March 16, 2009 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Status Conference held on 3/16/2009. (Court Reporter Stephen Daner) (js)
March 11, 2009 NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 3/16/2009 11:00 AM in Camden - COURTROOM 5A before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (gn)
March 11, 2009 Filing 31 Letter from THOMAS B. LEWIS regarding CONSENT ORDER. (MACDONALD, JOHN)
March 11, 2009 Filing 30 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS B. LEWIS and JOHN E. MACDONALD for JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC added. Attorney BRENT A. COSSROW terminated.. (MACDONALD, JOHN)
March 4, 2009 Filing 29 Letter from Michael J. Zaretsky. (ZARETSKY, MICHAEL)
March 4, 2009 Filing 28 Letter from Joseph E. Gehring, Jr.. (GEHRING, JOSEPH)
March 3, 2009 Filing 27 DECLARATION re #16 Declaration (Second Supplemental) by ROBERT W. HOEY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZARETSKY, MICHAEL)
February 23, 2009 Filing 26 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/10/2009, before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Frank Gable, Telephone number 856-757-5088. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (nf, )
February 10, 2009 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 2/10/2009. (Court Reporter Frank Gable) (js)
February 10, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE by JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC of Withdrawal of Declaration of Robert W. Hoey on behalf of Janney Montgomery Scott with Certificate of Service (COSSROW, BRENT)
February 9, 2009 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: Document #22 filed on 2/9/09 by JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR. is not a motion but a declaration. THIS MESSAGE IS FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY. (js)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/9/09. (js)
February 9, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.. (GEHRING, JOSEPH)
February 9, 2009 Filing 21 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MICHAEL JAY ZARETSKY and MICHAEL JAY ZARETSKY for ROBERT W. HOEY added. Attorney BRENT A. COSSROW terminated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ZARETSKY, MICHAEL)
January 29, 2009 Filing 20 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/20/2009, before Judge Noel L Hillman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen J. Daner, Telephone number 609-393-3001. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2009. (nf, )
January 29, 2009 Filing 19 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/23/2009, before Judge Noel L Hillman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen J. Daner, Telephone number 609-393-3001. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2009. (nf, )
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/27/09. (js)
January 23, 2009 Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition to #10 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ROBERT W. HOEY, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(js)
January 23, 2009 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of ROBERT W. HOEY. (js)
January 23, 2009 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 1/23/2009. (Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner) (js)
January 23, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC. TRO Bond (GEHRING, JOSEPH)
January 22, 2009 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 1/22/2009. (Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner) (js)
January 22, 2009 Setting Deadlines as to #10 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion set for 2/17/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (js)
January 22, 2009 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Frank LaRosa filed by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.. (GEHRING, JOSEPH)
January 22, 2009 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Stephen DiModica filed by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.. (GEHRING, JOSEPH)
January 22, 2009 Filing 10 Supplemental MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Brokerage Raiding)(GEHRING, JOSEPH)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Temporarily Granting in part and Denying in part #4 Motion for TRO, PlaintiFf directed to post bond of $25,000.00 with the Court on or before January 23, 2009; Additional submissions due January 22, 2009; Oral argument set for January 23, 2009 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/22/2009. (gn, )
January 21, 2009 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Christopher P. Stief: $ 150, receipt number 100 308316 (js)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Christopher P. Stief, Esq Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, etc.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/20/09. (th, )
January 21, 2009 Filing 8 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Christopher P. Stief, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (th, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2009 re #5 MOTION for Christopher P. Stief, Esq. Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by ROBERT W. HOEY, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC. Ordered motion Granted. Hearing on Pltf's #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC. Ordered Granted in part as to paragraph 4 of temporary relief. Ordered Denied as to all other relief. Ordered additional submissions due by close of business day 1/22/09. Ordered defts opposition and affidavit of Hoey due 1/22/09. Ordered preliminary injunction hearing set for 1/23/09 @ 11:00 am. (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen Daner.) (th, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave for Christopher P. Stief, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ROBERT W. HOEY, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent A. Cossrow, #2 Declaration of Christopher P. Stief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(tf, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration of Notice, #3 Memorandum of Law, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Appendix of Unreported Decisions)(tf, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROBERT W. HOEY, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC. Days Due - 20. (tf, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.. (tf, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ROBERT W. HOEY, JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC (Filing fee $ 350. Receipt #308308), filed by THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tf, ) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC. v. HOEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE SMITH BARNEY DIVISION OF CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salomon Smith Barney Inc.)
Represented By: JOSEPH E. GEHRING, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANNEY MONTGOMERY SCOTT LLC
Represented By: BRENT A. COSSROW
Represented By: THOMAS B. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT W. HOEY
Represented By: BRENT A. COSSROW
Represented By: MICHAEL JAY ZARETSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?