WORSTER-SIMS et al v. TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al

Plaintiff: JAMIE DEE WORSTER-SIMS and ASHLEE SIMS
Defendant: TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT, INC., TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, LLC, TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, LLC, TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORP., TROPICANA AC SUB CORP., PROVIDENCE AC, INC., METRONOME HOSPITALITY GROUP, ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10, MICHAEL JONES, ATLANTIC CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT, CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY and JOHN DOE(S) 1-10
Case Number: 1:2013cv01981
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 195 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/12/2016. (dmr)
September 9, 2016 190 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/8/2016. (tf, )
November 10, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff is granted leave to depose Chief Jubilee, Chief Mooney, Capt. T. Friel, Capt. R. Roff and a Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) witness to testify about Atlantic City's "early warning system" from 2001-2012, and how it was used or applied to Officer Jones by no later than 12/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/9/2015. (tf, )
October 6, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/6/2014. (tf, )
September 11, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: ORDERED that defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Pleading to Include a Third-Party Complaint Against Beau Cantera 74 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/10/2014. (tf, )
June 3, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' 36 , 40 and 45 motions for leave to amend their answers to include a third-party complaint naming Beau Cantera are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/2/2014. (tf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WORSTER-SIMS et al v. TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE DEE WORSTER-SIMS
Represented By: JONATHAN M. COHEN
Represented By: JOSEPH M. MARRONE, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL DANIEL POMERANTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEE SIMS
Represented By: JONATHAN M. COHEN
Represented By: JOSEPH M. MARRONE, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL DANIEL POMERANTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT INTERMEDIATE HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICANA ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Represented By: RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICANA ATLANTIC CITY CORP.
Represented By: RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICANA AC SUB CORP.
Represented By: RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROVIDENCE AC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METRONOME HOSPITALITY GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLANTIC CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?