STADLER v. ABRAMS et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN M. STADLER
Defendant: GLENN ABRAMS, JR., JOHN A. DEVLIN and K-9 OFFICER CLANCY (ANIMAL)
Case Number: 1:2013cv02741
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 302 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/17/2018. (tf, )
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/27/2018. (tf, )
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/4/2017. (tf, )
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 139 defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings; Count III of the amended complaint is dismissed. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/22/2017. (tf, n.m.)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that plaintiff shall notify this Court within fourteen (14) days stating whether he intends to oppose moving defendants' outstanding motion for judgment on the pleadings; defendants may file a reply in support of their motion for judgment on the pleadings within seven (7) days of plaintiff's response in opposition to the motion should such an opposition to their motion be filed. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/31/2017. (tf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STADLER v. ABRAMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN M. STADLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN ABRAMS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. DEVLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K-9 OFFICER CLANCY (ANIMAL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?