MORRIS et al v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: RONALD J. MORRIS and KRISTEN PICKEL
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY and CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2013cv03244
Filed: May 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Gloucester
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/29/2019. (rss, )
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 273 CLERK'S ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part re 272 and 260 Bill of Costs filed by Plaintiff RONALD J. MORRIS, and JUDGMENT be entered in favor of Plaintiff RONALD J. MORRIS and against Defendant CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION in the amount of $10,231.25. (William T. Walsh, Clerk) (jo, )
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 OPINION re. 144 filed. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/19/2015. (drw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRIS et al v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD J. MORRIS
Represented By: JUSTIN R. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN PICKEL
Represented By: JUSTIN R. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?