NERI v. NEW JERSEY STATE PAROLE BOARD et al
Plaintiff: PHILIP G. NERI
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE PAROLE BOARD, JAMES PLOUIS, CRAIG SHINDEWOLF, D'AMICO and S. BROWN
Case Number: 1:2013cv03722
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Burlington
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/4/2017. (tf, n.m.)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing the Clerk to REOPEN this case. The Court shall not rule on plaintiff's application at this time as he has failed to update his address with the Court in this action; directing the Clerk to re-close this matter. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/23/2015. (drw)n.m.
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/6/2014. (tf, n.m.)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/26/2013. (nz, )n.m.
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/28/2013. (bdk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NERI v. NEW JERSEY STATE PAROLE BOARD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP G. NERI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE PAROLE BOARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES PLOUIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAIG SHINDEWOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'AMICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?