SMART v. OASIN et al
Plaintiff: SALAHUDDIN F. SMART
Defendant: ALEXANDRA B. OASIN, ALEXANDRO URBINA, DEBORAH ECHELBERGER, DIVISION OF YOUTH AND FAMILY SERVICES, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, NORA P. PEARCE, JOHN DOE POLICE OFFICER, BOROUGH OF MAGNOLIA and JOHN DOE
Case Number: 1:2013cv04339
Filed: July 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/19/2017. (rtm, )
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Clerk shall file the 19 Amended Complaint, and replace the defendants named in the caption as stated. ORDERED that the Amended Complaint shall be permitted to proceed past screening in its entirety. ORDERED that the Clerk shall file and mail the USM 285 letter, then issue summons upon the Marshals notification. (Memo Order, Pro Bono application, and USM Letter mailed). Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/29/2016. (TH, )
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER Clerk shall reopen this case. ORDERED IFP is DENIED and Clerk shall re-administratively terminate this case. ORDERED Clerk shall send Plaintiff a blank IFP application and a copy of this Order. ORDERED Plaintiff has 30 days to reopen this matter.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/5/2014. (nz, )n.m.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMART v. OASIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALAHUDDIN F. SMART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRA B. OASIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXANDRO URBINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBORAH ECHELBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIVISION OF YOUTH AND FAMILY SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORA P. PEARCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE POLICE OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF MAGNOLIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?