CASTELLANI v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY et al
Plaintiff: DAVID CONNOR CASTELLANI
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY, STERLING WHEATEN, DARREN LORADY, POLICE OFFICERS JOHN DOE #1-4, AVETTE HARPER, Kevin Law, Scott Sendrick and MATTHEW ROGERS
Case Number: 1:2013cv05848
Filed: October 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 365 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 7/20/2017. (dmr)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 219 Motion to Quash Defendants' subpoena; granting non-party Jill Houck's 238 Motion to Quash Defendants' subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/31/2017. (dmr)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: Plaintiff's request for an additional 2 week extension to file his opposition to Defendants' motions for summary judgment; ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition paper are due 3/8/2017 and Defendants' reply papers are due 3/17/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/1/2017. (dmr)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 56 Motion for Protective Order and ordering Defendant Atlantic City to produce to Plaintiff copies of the Defendant Officers IA files redacted only as to social security numbers, birth dates, and motor vehicle information; and that production shall be completed by no later than twenty (20) days from entry of this Order; such production shall be subject to the consent confidentiality order entered on June 5, 2014.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/9/15. (dd, )
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/15/2014. (dmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASTELLANI v. CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CONNOR CASTELLANI
Represented By: JENNIFER ANN BONJEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF ATLANTIC CITY
Represented By: PATRICK J. WOLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLING WHEATEN
Represented By: PATRICK J. WOLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARREN LORADY
Represented By: PATRICK J. WOLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICERS JOHN DOE #1-4
Represented By: PATRICK J. WOLFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVETTE HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Sendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?