DENOFA v. D'ILIO et al
Petitioner: JOHN DENOFA
Respondent: STEPHEN D'ILIO and THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 1:2013cv07830
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/30/17. (js)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/21/2015. (TH, )
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Petitioner's 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Traverse on or before 3/30/2015. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/18/2015. (TH, )
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/13/2015. (TH, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DENOFA v. D'ILIO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN DENOFA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEPHEN D'ILIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?