SABINSA CORPORATION V. HERBAKRAFT, INC., et al
Plaintiff: SABINSA CORPORATION
Defendant: HERBAKRAFT, INC. and PRAKRUTI PRODUCTS PVT. LTD.
Counter_claimant: HERBAKRAFT, INC.
Counter_defendant: SABINSA CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2014cv04738
Filed: July 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Middlesex
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees as to the time entries of Arent Fox in the amount of $878,548.56. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 4/20/2022. (tf, )
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/22/2021. (dmr)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/30/2020. (dmr)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Redact and Seal Transcript,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/25/18. (dd, )
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/4/22017. (dmr)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/27/2017. (dmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SABINSA CORPORATION V. HERBAKRAFT, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABINSA CORPORATION
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: SEAN R. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERBAKRAFT, INC.
Represented By: PATRICIA M. LOVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRAKRUTI PRODUCTS PVT. LTD.
Represented By: ERIC I. ABRAHAM
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: HERBAKRAFT, INC.
Represented By: PATRICIA M. LOVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: SABINSA CORPORATION
Represented By: KATHERINE ANN ESCANLAR
Represented By: SEAN R. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?