WADHWA v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Plaintiff: DOM WADHWA, M.D.
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Case Number: 1:2015cv02777
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 44 Motion to Redact 43 Transcript. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/9/2018. (dmr)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Plaintiff's [17,24,28,32] Motion for Judgment by Default, Motion for Judgment by Default and Motion to Deny Summary Judgment, and Motion(s) to Impose Sanctions are DENIED. ORDER that this Court's November 22, 2016 Opinion and Order (Doc Nos. 13, 14) are VACATED. Defendant's 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/22/2017. (tf, )
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/22/2016. (tf, )
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/11/2016. (tf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WADHWA v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOM WADHWA, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: DANIEL J. GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?