THE BANCORP BANK v. CONDOR DEVELOPERS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: THE BANCORP BANK
Defendant: CONDOR DEVELOPERS, LLC, DANIEL BROWN, NJG ACQUISITIONS, LLC, EVERYWHERE AND NOW PUBLIC HOUSING RESIDENTS ORGANIZING NATIONALLY TOGETHER, INC. and STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 1:2015cv04451
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER permitting the Receiver 90 days to enter into a sale of the property, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/25/2019. (dmr)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/2/2019. (tf, )
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/4/2017. (tf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE BANCORP BANK v. CONDOR DEVELOPERS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BANCORP BANK
Represented By: PHILIP S. ROSENZWEIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONDOR DEVELOPERS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJG ACQUISITIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVERYWHERE AND NOW PUBLIC HOUSING RESIDENTS ORGANIZING NATIONALLY TOGETHER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?