TURNER v. JANE DOE et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY A. TURNER
Defendant: JANE DOE, J.T. SHARTLE, NORWOOD, JOHN DOE, SCOTT and GONZALEZ
Case Number: 1:2015cv05942
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/17/2018. (tf, n.m.)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/16/18. n.m.(dd, )
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/27/2017. (tf, n.m.)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/19/16. (js)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Pltf's 4 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; directing the Clerk to file the Amended Complaint; directing the Clerk to terminate Defts John Doe, Jane Doe, J.T. Shartle and Mr. Norwood; permitting the A mended Complaint to proceed against Defts Ms. Scott and Mr. Gonzales; directing the Clerk to issue summons for USM to serve the Amended Complaint, this Order and the 2 Opinion upon Defts Scott and Gonzales. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/1/2015. (drw)n.m.
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/15/2015. (bdk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TURNER v. JANE DOE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY A. TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. SHARTLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?