SHAH v. HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY
Plaintiff: RAHUL SHAH, M.D.
Defendant: HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 1:2015cv08590
Filed: December 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/13/2018. (rtm, )
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/9/2018. (dmr)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/25/2016. (TH, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHAH v. HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAHUL SHAH, M.D.
Represented By: MATTHEW RICHARD MAJOR
Represented By: SAMUEL S. SALTMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HORIZON BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: MICHAEL E. HOLZAPFEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?