KUHAR et al v. PETZL COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS KUHAR and JULIE KUHAR
Defendant: PETZL COMPANY, PETZL AMERICA, INC, BAILEY'S CORPORATION, UNLIMITED XYZ CORPORATIONS and UNLIMITED JOHN DOES
Cross_claimant: BAILEY'S CORPORATION
Cross_defendant: BAILEY'S CORPORATION, PETZL AMERICA, INC, PETZL COMPANY, UNLIMITED JOHN DOES and UNLIMITED XYZ CORPORATIONS
Case Number: 1:2016cv00395
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Salem
Presiding Judge: Joel Schneider
Presiding Judge: Jerome B. Simandle
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Summary Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendants Bailey's Corporation, Uintah Fastener & Supply, Petzl Corporation, Petzl America, Brighton Best, Inc., and Porteous Fastener Co. as to all of Plaintiffs' claims ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/19/2019. (tf, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER ADOPTING 337 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 183 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED that summary judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant Quality Plating as to all of Plaintiffs' claims and all cross-claims. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/31/2019. (dmr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 280 Motion to Strike Defendant Porteous/Brighton Best's Experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/12/2019. (dmr)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/10/2018. (dmr)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting 188 Motion in Limine to Exclude Defendant Bailey's Liability Expert Testimony. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/4/2018. (dmr)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 8/6/2018. (rtm, )
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 6/9/17. (js)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION FILED. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 7/19/16. (js)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUHAR et al v. PETZL COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS KUHAR
Represented By: KEVIN P. MCCANN
Represented By: BRETT CODY SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE KUHAR
Represented By: KEVIN P. MCCANN
Represented By: BRETT CODY SCHNEIDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETZL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETZL AMERICA, INC
Represented By: ROBERT GEORGE DEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAILEY'S CORPORATION
Represented By: GARY ALAN HURWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNLIMITED XYZ CORPORATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNLIMITED JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: BAILEY'S CORPORATION
Represented By: GARY ALAN HURWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: BAILEY'S CORPORATION
Represented By: GARY ALAN HURWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PETZL AMERICA, INC
Represented By: ROBERT GEORGE DEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: PETZL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: UNLIMITED JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: UNLIMITED XYZ CORPORATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?