LEE v. JOHNSON et al
Petitioner: DEAN LEE
Respondent: STEVEN JOHNSON and JOHN J. HOFFMAN
Case Number: 1:2016cv00477
Filed: January 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Granting Petitioner's request to stay the amended habeas petition and hold it in abeyance, etc.; ORDERED that within 45 days from the date of entry of this Order, Petitioner shall provide proof to the Court that he is proceeding with his unexhausted claims in state court; ORDERED that the Clerk shall administratively terminate this action. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/28/2018. (dmr)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER reserving ruling on Petitioners motion for a stay and abeyance of his amended habeas petition; ORDERED that, within 45 days of the date of this Order, Petitioner and Respondents shall each file a supplemental brief on the issues identified in the Order; ORDERED that Respondent shall file an answer to the amended petition within 45 days, etc.; ORDERED that Petitioner may file and serve a reply to the answer within 45 days after the answer is filed. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/21/2017. (dmr)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing Respondent to file a Motion to Dismiss or an Answer within 45 days, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/9/2016. (dmr)(n.m.)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Petitioner's request for an extension 6 ; ORDERED that petitioner may file his response to the order to show cause on or before 6/28/2016. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/14/2016. (dmr)(n.m.)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER directing the Clerk to reopen this case; ORDERED that the petitioner shall show cause within 30 days of the date of this Order why his habeas petition should not be dismissed as untimely under 28 U.S.C. 2244(d)(1), etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/28/2016. (dmr)(n.m.)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, The Clerk shall administratively terminate this case, etc.; ORDERED that the Clerk's service of the blank habeas petition form shall not be construed as this court's finding that the original petition is or is not timely, etc.; ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case, he shall so notify the Court in writing within 30 days, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/29/2016. (dmr)(n.m.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DEAN LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STEVEN JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN J. HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?