NIBLACK v. GOULD et al

Plaintiff: STANLEY L. NIBLACK
Defendant: WILLIAM GOULD, MOORE, CALISKI, MUTCHERSON and CHARLES RAY HUGHES
Case Number: 1:2016cv00494
Filed: January 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Hudson
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Presiding Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/23/2017. (TH, )
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that this Court will conduct a screening of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in due course. ORDERED that it is unnecessary for Defendants to file a Response to the Amended Complaint until screening is completed. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/23/2017. (TH, )
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/19/16. (js)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file a response to defendants' motion to dismiss is granted; plaintiff shall have until thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to file his response to the motion to dismiss; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/6/2016. (tf, n.m.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIBLACK v. GOULD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY L. NIBLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM GOULD
Represented By: ADAM ROBERT GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALISKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUTCHERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES RAY HUGHES
Represented By: ADAM ROBERT GIBBONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?