WOODALL v. PORRINO et al
Petitioner: DARA WOODALL
Respondent: CHRISTOPHER PORRINO and WILLIAM ANDERSON
Case Number: 1:2017cv01847
Filed: March 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/22/2019. (dmr)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/1/2018. (tf, n.m.)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM, ORDER Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this case for Petitioners failure to either pay the filing fee of $5.00 or submit a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Directing Clerk to to send Petitioner a blank IFP application. nm 4/21. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/21/17. (jbk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOODALL v. PORRINO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DARA WOODALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHRISTOPHER PORRINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?