HEFFLEY v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS FCI FORT DIX et al
Plaintiff: TRAVIS HEFFLEY
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS FCI FORT DIX and UNKNOWN MEMBER OF EXTRACTION TEAM EMPLOYED BY FCI FORT DIX
Case Number: 1:2017cv03647
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Burlington
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER vacating the order to show cause 35 considering Plaintiff's response. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/23/2022. (dmr)(n.m.)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying without prejudice, 32 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERED that within 45 days of this Order, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of service and failure to comply with this Court's orders. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/2/2022. (dmr)(n.m.)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 5/16/2022. (dmr)(n.m.)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER administratively terminating 32 Motion for Summary Judgment pending a decision on the motion to amend; ORDERED that the Court will reinstate the summary judgment motion after the motion to amend has been decided. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/11/2022. (dmr)(n.m.)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. ORDERED that the notice of call for dismissal, ECF No. 15 , is vacated; ORDERED that the complaint shall proceed; ORDERED that the Clerk shall substitute Christopher Ebinger, Gregory Dobovich, John Mathes, Kevin Bullock, Mark Holterman, and Robert Samynek for Unknown Member Of Extraction Team Employed By FCI Fort Dix on the docket; ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to Plaintiff a transmittal letter, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/9/2020. (dmr)(n.m.)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/23/17. (jbk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEFFLEY v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS FCI FORT DIX et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS HEFFLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS FCI FORT DIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN MEMBER OF EXTRACTION TEAM EMPLOYED BY FCI FORT DIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?