THOMAS-FISH v. AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC et al
Plaintiff: HELEN THOMAS-FISH
Defendant: AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC, DOVER CORPORATION, DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC., RBC SONIC, RBC BEARINGS INCORPORATED, SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC, SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC., AETNA STEEL PRODUCTS CORPORATION, JOHN DOE CORPORATONS 1-50, RBC SARGENT AIRTOMIC and ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2017cv10648
Filed: November 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 6/4/2019. (dmr)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION ORDER Severing the claims against Defendants Avborne Accessory Group, Inc.; Dover Corporation; Dover Engineered Systems, Inc.; RBC Bearings, Incorporated; Sargent Aerospace & Defense, LLC; Sargent Industries, Inc.; RBC Sargent Airtomic; and Roller Bearing Company of America, Inc. and TRANSFERRING those claims to the District of Delaware. The Court will hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on September 7, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/7/18. (dd, )
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/31/18. (dd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS-FISH v. AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVBORNE ACCESSORY GROUP, INC
Represented By: WILLIAM D. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOVER CORPORATION
Represented By: WILLIAM D. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOVER ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM D. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC SONIC
Represented By: WILLIAM D. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC BEARINGS INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARGENT AEROSPACE & DEFENSE, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM D. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARGENT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM D. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA STEEL PRODUCTS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC SARGENT AIRTOMIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLLER BEARING COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM D. SANDERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN THOMAS-FISH
Represented By: AMBER ROSE LONG
Represented By: JOSEPH J. MANDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?