MAERSK LINE v. TJM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MAERSK LINE
Defendant: CHERYL MARSH, MARSH AND ASSOCIATES SIGNING SERVICES LLC and TJM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv11668
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:741
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to TJM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY and MARSH AND ASSOCIATES SIGNING SERVICES LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (rss, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Default by MAERSK LINE against TJM International Limited Liability Company and Marsh and Associates Signing Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(STEINBERG, RICK)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAERSK LINE. CHERYL MARSH served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (STEINBERG, RICK)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAERSK LINE. MARSH AND ASSOCIATES SIGNING SERVICES LLC served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (STEINBERG, RICK)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAERSK LINE. TJM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018. (STEINBERG, RICK)
July 17, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHERYL MARSH, MARSH AND ASSOCIATES SIGNING SERVICES LLC, TJM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTOPHER YOOS* (cry, )
July 16, 2018 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAERSK LINE identifying A.P. Moller Maersk A/S as Corporate Parent.. (STEINBERG, RICK)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cheryl Marsh, Marsh and Associates Signing Services, LLC, TJM International Limited Liability Company ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8884973), filed by MAERSK LINE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(STEINBERG, RICK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAERSK LINE v. TJM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAERSK LINE
Represented By: RICK A. STEINBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHERYL MARSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSH AND ASSOCIATES SIGNING SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?