YEUNG et al v. SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY and AUDREY YEUNG
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC., XYZ INSURANCE COMPANIES 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD. and ABC CORPS. 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv11672
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2018. (sb)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/13/2018 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Defense counsel shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/11/2018. (slc)
September 5, 2018 NOTICE: Joint Discovery Plan due to Judge Donio's Chambers for 9/11/18 Scheduling Conference. See Order dated 7/17/18. (sb)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.. (TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC..(TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ORDERED that Defendants shall have fifteen (15) days to amend their notice of removal to properly comply with 28 U.S.C. 1332. If Defendants fail to do so, this case will be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/19/18. (dd, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/11/2018 11:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/17/2018. (rss, )
July 17, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (rss, )
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/17/2018. (rss, )
July 17, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (rss, )
July 17, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (rss, )
July 16, 2018 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Cumberland County, case number CUM-L-275-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8885115), filed by SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC..(TRUCILLO, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YEUNG et al v. SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL L. TRUCILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ INSURANCE COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL C. VACCARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY YEUNG
Represented By: MICHAEL C. VACCARO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?