VEGA v. ORTIZ et al
Petitioner: GERALDO VEGA
Respondent: JANE DOE NO.'S 1-10, JOHN DOE NO.'S 1-10, WARDEN DAVID ORTIZ, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and FCI FORT DIX
Case Number: 1:2018cv13180
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #4 Respondents letter request for an extension of time, nunc pro tunc, to respond to the petition. Respondent shall respond to the petition by October 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/25/2018. (rtm, )(nm)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Exhibit to #5 Response to Habeas Petition, Redacted Attachments to the Declaration of Edith Rohmer by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FCI FORT DIX, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DAVID ORTIZ. (O'NEILL, JESSICA)
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FCI FORT DIX, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DAVID ORTIZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edith Rohmer, #2 Exhibit Attachments to the Declaration of Edith Rohmer, #3 Certificate of Service)(O'NEILL, JESSICA)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from AUSA O'Neill with proposed order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'NEILL, JESSICA)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA ROSE O'NEILL on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FCI FORT DIX, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DAVID ORTIZ (O'NEILL, JESSICA)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER within forty-five days of the date of the entry of this Order, Respondents shall file and serve an Answer which responds to the allegations; ORDERED that the clerk shall serve a copy of this order as well as #1 the petition upon the respondent, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/28/2018. (rtm, )(nm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number CAM009900.), filed by GERALDO VEGA. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(aji, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VEGA v. ORTIZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JANE DOE NO.'S 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE NO.'S 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN DAVID ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: JESSICA ROSE O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: JESSICA ROSE O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: JESSICA ROSE O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI FORT DIX
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: JESSICA ROSE O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GERALDO VEGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?