BROWN v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Plaintiff: SHARON BROWN
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv13823
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Ann Marie Donio
1 Judge: Jerome B Simandle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, )
November 1, 2018 16 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Burlington County Courthouse49 Rancocas RoadMount Holly, NJ 08060 State No: BUR L 1768 18. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (tf, )
November 1, 2018 15 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER that any and all claims set forth against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company in Count Two of the Complaint, including, but not limited to, any claims for bad faith, breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing, punitive damages and attorneys' fees are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Plaintiff, Sharon Brown's damage claims are capped at $74,999.00; this matter is remanded to the Superior Court of New Jersey-Law Division, Burlington County. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/1/2018. (tf, )
November 1, 2018 NOTICE: Telephone conference on 11/5/2018 shall be, and is hereby, adjourned. (slc)
October 31, 2018 14 Letter from Robert T. Pindulic, Esq. to Judge Ann Marie Donio Attaching Proposed Consent Order. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(PINDULIC, ROBERT)
October 22, 2018 13 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 2:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/22/2018. (slc)
October 19, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER granting request to stay re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, #8 MOTION to Remand filed by SHARON BROWN. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 10/19/2018. (tf, )
October 17, 2018 11 Letter from Robert T. Pindulic, Esq. to Hon. Jerome B. Simandle, U.S.D.J. 10-17-18 Request Motions Be Temporarily Stayed. (PINDULIC, ROBERT)
October 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/16/2018. (sb)
October 16, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MARIO LAWRENCE BARNABEI on behalf of SHARON BROWN (BARNABEI, MARIO)
October 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
October 10, 2018 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHARON BROWN. (DIULIO, ANTHONY)
October 10, 2018 8 MOTION to Remand by SHARON BROWN. (DIULIO, ANTHONY)
October 9, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Demand for Trial by Jury #6 submitted by Anthony Diulio on 10/9/2018 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
October 9, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The MOTION to Remand #5 submitted by Anthony Diulio on 10/9/2018 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
October 9, 2018 7 Joint Discovery Plan by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(PINDULIC, ROBERT)
October 9, 2018 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHARON BROWN. (DIULIO, ANTHONY)
October 9, 2018 5 MOTION to Remand by SHARON BROWN. (DIULIO, ANTHONY)
October 2, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
October 2, 2018 4 MOTION to Dismiss by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(PINDULIC, ROBERT)
September 13, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
September 13, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Initial Conference set for 10/16/2018 11:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/13/2018. (cry, )
September 13, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #1 submitted by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY on 9/12/2018 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/03/2018. (cry, )
September 12, 2018 Judge Jerome B. Simandle and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
September 12, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY identifying State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (PINDULIC, ROBERT)
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY from Burlington County, case number BUR-L-1768-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9018650), filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order Application for Extension of Time To Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead, #4 Certification, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service)(PINDULIC, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON BROWN
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO
Represented By: MARIO LAWRENCE BARNABEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT T. PINDULIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?