J.C. v. RICHARDS et al

Plaintiff: J.C.
Defendant: GENE RICHARDS, CHARLES GROVER, SGT. ROBERT WORRICK, KIMBERLY MORRELL, DONNA CARNS, ANTHONY H. OGOZALEK JR., RANDALL FREILING, JENAI JOHNSON and BOROUGH OF CLEMENTON
Case Number: 1:2018cv13947
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Noel L Hillman
1 Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff fifteen (15) days to amend his complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/1/2018. (rss, n.m.)
October 5, 2018 4 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 Order to Show Cause. (rtm, )(nm)
September 18, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days to amend his complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/18/2018. (tf, n.m.)
September 18, 2018 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOROUGH OF CLEMENTON, DONNA CARNS, RANDALL FREILING, CHARLES GROVER, JENAI JOHNSON, KIMBERLY MORRELL, ANTHONY H. OGOZALEK JR., GENE RICHARDS, ROBERT WORRICK with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (cry, )
September 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against BOROUGH OF CLEMENTON, DONNA CARNS, RANDALL FREILING, CHARLES GROVER, JENAI JOHNSON, KIMBERLY MORRELL, AMTHONY H. OGOZALEK JR., GENE RICHARDS, ROBERT WORRICK ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CAM009952) with JURY DEMAND, filed by J.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.C. v. RICHARDS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENE RICHARDS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES GROVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. ROBERT WORRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY MORRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONNA CARNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY H. OGOZALEK JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDALL FREILING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENAI JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOROUGH OF CLEMENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?