MALL CHEVROLET, INC. v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Plaintiff: MALL CHEVROLET, INC.
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv15077
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jerome B Simandle
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALL CHEVROLET, INC.. (TRIANTOS, JONATHAN)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James C. McGrath, Esquire, and Andrew T. Stark, Esquire, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/12/2018. (dmr)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 Certification on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (COHEN, JEREMY)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by GENERAL MOTORS LLC.(COHEN, JEREMY)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA D. RUCCOLO on behalf of MALL CHEVROLET, INC. (RUCCOLO, LAURA)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION in Support filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC re #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of James C. McGrath), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Andrew T. Stark))(COHEN, JEREMY)
October 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
October 29, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declarations of James C. McGrath and Andrew T. Stark attached to the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #6 submitted by Defendant on 10/26/2018 contain improper signatures. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT with a scanned signature using the "Certification" event found under Responses and Replies This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy A. Cohen in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of James C. McGrath and Andrew T. Stark, #2 Declaration of James C. McGrath in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Declaration of Andrew T. Stark in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(COHEN, JEREMY)
October 26, 2018 Clerk's Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GENERAL MOTORS LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/8/2018. (dmr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (COHEN, JEREMY)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL MOTORS LLC identifying General Motors Holding LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COHEN, JEREMY)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY A. COHEN on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS LLC (COHEN, JEREMY)
October 18, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (rss, )
October 18, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (rss, )
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 12/20/2018 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/18/2018. (rss, )
October 18, 2018 Judge Jerome B. Simandle and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GENERAL MOTORS LLC from Camden Superior Court, case number CAM-L-003563-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9105216), filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Superior Court Civil Action Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Superior Court Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(COHEN, JEREMY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALL CHEVROLET, INC. v. GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS LLC
Represented By: JEREMY A. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALL CHEVROLET, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Represented By: JONATHAN L. TRIANTOS
Represented By: LAURA D. RUCCOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?