NOVA INDUSTRIES, LLC v. MIMAKI USA
Plaintiff: NOVA SIGN GROUP INC. and NOVA INDUSTRIES, LLC
Defendant: MIMAKI USA
Case Number: 1:2018cv15781
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER NATHAN BLAKE on behalf of MIMAKI USA (BLAKE, ALEXANDER)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by MIMAKI USA. (BLAKE, ALEXANDER)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NOVA INDUSTRIES, LLC. MIMAKI USA waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (BUCCO, PAUL)
November 8, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MIMAKI USA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/8/2018) (ssp, ).
November 8, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ssp, )
November 8, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
November 7, 2018 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MIMAKI USA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9155677) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NOVA SIGN GROUP INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(BUCCO, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOVA INDUSTRIES, LLC v. MIMAKI USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVA SIGN GROUP INC.
Represented By: PAUL A. BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVA INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By: PAUL A. BUCCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIMAKI USA
Represented By: ALEXANDER NATHAN BLAKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?