RYECO, LLC v. STELLATO BOYS PRODUCE, LLP et al
Plaintiff: RYECO, LLC
Defendant: STELLATO BOYS PRODUCE, LLP, AMERICO STELLATO, JR., PAG PRODUCE & DELI, LLC, GIUSEPPE STELLATO and PELLEGRINO STELLATO
Case Number: 1:2018cv17154
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 01/24/2019. (db, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER vacating Stipulations and Order of Settlement, docket entry #9 and Final Order and Judgment, docket entry #10 . Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 01/24/2018. (db, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT in favor of RYECO, LLC against PAG PRODUCE & DELI, LLC, STELLATO BOYS PRODUCE, LLP, AMERICO STELLATO, JR., GIUSEPPE STELLATO, PELLEGRINO STELLATO in the amount of $51,039.50.***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 01/24/2019. (db, )
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 01/24/2019. (db, )
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER -- The Court having been advised that the case settled [Doc. No. 7], it is hereby ORDERED the January 23, 2019 conference is POSTPONED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/11/19. (Schneider, Joel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from David W. Fassett, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FASSETT, DAVID)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 1/23/2019 09:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/26/2018. (rss, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RYECO, LLC CONFIRMING SERVICE OF PROCESS (FASSETT, DAVID)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(MARIANI, DANIEL)
December 13, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAG PRODUCE & DELI, LLC, GIUSEPPE STELLATO, PELLEGRINO STELLATO, STELLATO BOYS PRODUCE, LLP, AMERICO STELLATO, JR.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ryeco, LLC. (FASSETT, DAVID)
December 13, 2018 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9238980), filed by Ryeco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Stellato Boys Produce, LLP d/b/a STELLATO BOYS PRODUCE & DELI, a/t/a M&R PRODUCE, #3 Summons PAG PRODUCE & DELI, LLC, #4 Summons Americo Stellato, Jr., #5 Summons Pellegrino Stellato, #6 Summons Guiseppe Stellato)(FASSETT, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RYECO, LLC v. STELLATO BOYS PRODUCE, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STELLATO BOYS PRODUCE, LLP
Represented By: DANIEL HENRY MARIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICO STELLATO, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL HENRY MARIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAG PRODUCE & DELI, LLC
Represented By: DANIEL HENRY MARIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIUSEPPE STELLATO
Represented By: DANIEL HENRY MARIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PELLEGRINO STELLATO
Represented By: DANIEL HENRY MARIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYECO, LLC
Represented By: DAVID W. FASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?