KEMP v. SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. et al

Plaintiff: JOHN T. KEMP
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC., LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION and DOES 1-50
Case Number: 1:2018cv17215
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED the Scheduling Conference on February 13, 2019 is POSTPONED and will be rescheduled if necessary after defendant's Motion to Dismiss is decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/7/2019. (se, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Robert D. Bailey. (BAILEY, ROBERT)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Initial Conference set for 2/13/2019 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/7/2019. (cry, )
January 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 2/4/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC.. Responses due by 1/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Robert D. Bailey, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Certificate of Service)(BAILEY, ROBERT)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by BEN ZEV RAINDORF on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RAINDORF, BEN)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES W. MILLER, III on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, CHARLES)
December 18, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notices of Appearance #9 , #10 , and #11 submitted by Robert Bailey on 12/18/2018 all appear to be duplicates. The Notices of Appearance of Charles Miller and Ben Raindorf must contain the signatures of those attorneys. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BEN ZEV RAINDORF on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RAINDORF, BEN)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES W. MILLER, III on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, CHARLES)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT D. BAILEY on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BAILEY, ROBERT)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (dd, )
December 14, 2018 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-02348. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 13, 2018 Case transferred to the USDC for the District of New Jersey, pursuant to Court Order entered 12/3/18. Sent to Court Extraction. (ztd)
December 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 1/4/2019. (kt)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' second motion for extension of time #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before January 4, 2019 unless otherwise ordered by the transferee court. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/12/2018. (lcrdm3, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. (Diemer, Mary)
December 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 12/13/2018. (kt)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey. 28 U.S.C. 1404. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/3/2018. (lcrdm3, )
November 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 12/14/2018. (kt)
November 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' motion for extension of time #4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/24/2018. (lcrdm3, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diemer, Mary)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, filed by JOHN T. KEMP. (ztd)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018 (ztd)
October 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to Show Cause due by 11/16/2018. (kt)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause on or before November 16, 2018, why this case should not be dismissed or transferred for lack of proper venue. See 28 U.S.C. 1391, 1404. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/16/2018. (lcrdm3, )
October 12, 2018 Summons (2) Issued as to LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC.. (jf)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE, LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616094942) with Jury Demand filed by JOHN T. KEMP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEMP v. SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SELECT PORTFOLIO, INC.
Represented By: BEN ZEV RAINDORF
Represented By: ROBERT D. BAILEY
Represented By: CHARLES W. MILLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: BEN ZEV RAINDORF
Represented By: ROBERT D. BAILEY
Represented By: CHARLES W. MILLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Represented By: BEN ZEV RAINDORF
Represented By: CHARLES W. MILLER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN T. KEMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?