BRACCIODIETA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: CHARLES BRACCIODIETA
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv17280
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Clerk to reopen this case; Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to Petitioners #1 motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence within 30 days of entry of this Order, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/6/2019. (rss,n.m. )
January 18, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, )
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to administratively terminate this case until expiration of Standing Order 18-4, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/18/2019. (rss, n.m.)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Respondent to file an answer to Petitioners motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 within 45 days of entry of this Order, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/20/2018. (rss,n.m. )
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 06-716 (RMB), filed by CHARLES BRACCIODIETA. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Reciept)(ssp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRACCIODIETA v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHARLES BRACCIODIETA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MATTHEW J. SKAHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?