JAMES v. ANTONELLI

Petitioner: Willie D. James
Respondent: B. M. Antonelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv00445
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: New Jersey District Court
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, )
January 14, 2019 26 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 1:18-cv-01839. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 11, 2019 24 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #23 Order on Report and Recommendation placed in U.S. Mail to Willie D. James. (lbak)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 23 ORDER affirming #20 Report and Recommendation, transferring case to the US District Court for the District of New Jersey. It is further ordered that a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/11/2019.(eric, )
December 21, 2018 21 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Willie D. James (bgoo)
December 21, 2018 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/21/2018. (bgoo)
October 15, 2018 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 18 Text Order placed in U.S. Mail to Willie D. James (bgoo)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 18 TEXT ORDER vacating #14 order in light of Petitioner's #17 response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/15/2018. (bgoo)
October 15, 2018 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMand for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response filed by Willie D. James. Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/22/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/15/2018 with corrected scan of document.) (bgoo)
October 15, 2018 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Willie D. James (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)
October 15, 2018 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Order placed in U.S. Mail to Willie D. James (bgoo)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 14 ORDER directing Petitioner to advise the court as to whether he wishes to continue with this case and to file a response to Respondent's #10 motion to dismiss by October 29, 2018. Petitioner is further advised that if he fails to respond, the undersigned will recommend that this action be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/15/2018. (bgoo)
September 5, 2018 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Roseboro Order placed in U.S. Mail to Willie D. James (bgoo)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Jurisdiction by 10/9/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/5/2018. (bgoo)
September 4, 2018 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Jurisdiction by B. M. Antonelli. Response to Motion due by 9/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Response to 2241 Petition and in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Daley, Robert)
July 23, 2018 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #7 Order 2241 Federal Habeas and copy of petition served on US Attorney General on 7/17/2018. (bgoo)
July 13, 2018 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order 2241 Federal Habeas placed in U.S. Mail to Willie D. James and #7 Order 2241 Federal Habeas and copy of Petition sent via certified mail to the U.S. Attorney (Article No. 7004 1160 0002 3808 5803). (bgoo)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk. Directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Habeas Petition) (bgoo)
July 10, 2018 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX600007993 (jsmi, )
July 5, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Willie D. James. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES v. ANTONELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie D. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. M. Antonelli
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?