DENNIS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner: RALPH DENNIS
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00893
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jerome B Simandle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER advising petitioner of rights under US V. MILLER and directing petitioner to advise the Court in 30 days. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/21/2019. (tf, n.m.)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Signature page to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by RALPH DENNIS. (rss, )
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 12-00734 (JBS), filed by RALPH DENNIS. Document ends at page 30, contains no certification/ signature. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ssp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DENNIS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS
Represented By: GABRIEL JOHN VIDONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RALPH DENNIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?