WIGGLESWORTH v. MAIDEN HOLDINGS, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WIGGLESWORTH
Defendant: ARTURO M. RASCHBAUM, KAREN L. SCHMITT, MAIDEN HOLDINGS, LTD. and JOHN M. MARSHALECK
Case Number: 1:2019cv05296
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL WIGGLESWORTH. KAREN L. SCHMITT served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (CECCHI, JAMES)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL WIGGLESWORTH. JOHN M. MARSHALECK served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (CECCHI, JAMES)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATED ORDER staying any obligation on the part of Defendants to respond to the complaint until after this Court has appointed lead plaintiff and lead counsel,pursuant to the PSLRA, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/29/2019. (rtm, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from John D. Tortorella to the Honorable Renee M. Bumb, U.S.D.J., regarding Stipulation and Proposed Order re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 27, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael B. Carlinsky. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael B. Carlinsky by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael B. Carlinsky, #2 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rollo C. Baker, IV, and Jacob J. Waldman. Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
March 23, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rollo C. Baker, IV, and Jacob J. Waldman by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John D. Tortorella, #2 Certification of Rollo C. Baker, IV, #3 Certification of Jacob J. Waldman, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN D. TORTORELLA on behalf of All Defendants (TORTORELLA, JOHN)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN HARRY MARINO on behalf of All Defendants (MARINO, KEVIN)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to MAIDEN HOLDINGS, LTD., JOHN M. MARSHALECK, ARTURO M. RASCHBAUM, KAREN L. SCHMITT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, for failure to attach electronic summons)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MAIDEN HOLDINGS, LTD., JOHN M. MARSHALECK, ARTURO M. RASCHBAUM, KAREN L. SCHMITT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
February 11, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
February 11, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint (Plaintiff's Certification Pursuant to the Federal Securities Laws) by MICHAEL WIGGLESWORTH. (CECCHI, JAMES)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9403885) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL WIGGLESWORTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CECCHI, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WIGGLESWORTH v. MAIDEN HOLDINGS, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WIGGLESWORTH
Represented By: JAMES E. CECCHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTURO M. RASCHBAUM
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN D. TORTORELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN L. SCHMITT
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN D. TORTORELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIDEN HOLDINGS, LTD.
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN D. TORTORELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN M. MARSHALECK
Represented By: KEVIN HARRY MARINO
Represented By: JOHN D. TORTORELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?