KRAVITZ v. JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: HOWARD KRAVITZ
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 and JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07456
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER -- At the request of counsel, it is hereby ORDERED the May 14, 2019 settlement conference is rescheduled to May 24, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/12/19. (Schneider, Joel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel. (WALL, ZACHARY)
April 2, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Benjamin A. Shepler, Esq., #2 Certification of Kerri A. Wright, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(WRIGHT, KERRI)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCHNEIDER'S STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/28/2019. (rtm, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: In-person Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/28/2019. (rtm, )
March 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/27/2019. (se, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Defendants' letter request to excuse Mr. Shepler from the conference and permit local counsel to appear in person with full authority to act on behalf of the Defendants; All appearances by phone DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/18/2019. (rss, )
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER Denying Defendants request to appear by telephone at the conference scheduled for 3/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/13/2019. (rtm, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC..(WRIGHT, KERRI)
March 1, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 3/27/2019 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/1/2019. (cry, )
March 1, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (mmb, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC. identifying Tailored Brands, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (WRIGHT, KERRI)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC. from Superior Court of Camden County, case number CAM L 000324 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9462664), filed by JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(WRIGHT, KERRI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRAVITZ v. JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOS. A. BANK CLOTHIERS, INC.
Represented By: KERRI ANN WRIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD KRAVITZ
Represented By: ZACHARY R. WALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?